Rupe v. O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Rupe
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive, Inc., Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc, Omni Specialty Packaging, LLC, O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. and O'Reilly Automotive Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00164
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
2 Judge: Ross A Walters(R)
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332bw
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William L. Carr; granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bryan T. White. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 7/24/2019. (kjw)
July 24, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wayne Rupe. (White, Bryan)
July 24, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wayne Rupe. (Carr, William)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Edward T. Pivin; granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas P. Berra, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 7/11/2019. (kjw)
July 11, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3865445 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by O'Reilly Automotive Inc, O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., Omni Specialty Packaging, LLC, Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc. (Berra, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3865331 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by O'Reilly Automotive Inc, O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., Omni Specialty Packaging, LLC, Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc. (Pivin, Edward)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: For good cause, the Court grants #19 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint. Defendants may have to and including 8/12/2019 to move or respond to the Class Action Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 7/5/2019. (k)
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 Consented First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Class Action Complaint by O'Reilly Automotive Inc, O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., Omni Specialty Packaging, LLC, Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc.Motions referred to Ross A Walters(R). Responses due by 7/17/2019. (Ogden, Dennis) Modified on 7/3/2019 per attorney added "consented"(don).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas V. Bender. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 6/18/2019. (slg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wayne Rupe. (Bender, Thomas)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dirk Hubbard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 6/18/2019. (slg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3846351 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Wayne Rupe. (Hubbard, Dirk)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Rupe. Omni Specialty Packaging, LLC served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Lundberg, Paul)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Rupe. Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Lundberg, Paul)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Rupe. O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Lundberg, Paul)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Rupe. O'Reilly Automotive Inc served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Lundberg, Paul)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 ***ENTERED IN ERROR*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wayne Rupe (Lundberg, Paul) Modified on 6/17/2019 (slg).
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 ***ENTERED IN ERROR*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wayne Rupe (Lundberg, Paul) Modified on 6/17/2019 (slg).
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 ***ENTERED IN ERROR*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wayne Rupe (Lundberg, Paul) Modified on 6/17/2019 (slg).
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 ***ENTERED IN ERROR*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wayne Rupe (Lundberg, Paul) Modified on 6/17/2019 (slg).
June 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) added. Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (don)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Omni Specialty Packaging, LLC. (Lundberg, Paul) (Main Document 5 replaced and regenerated on 6/10/2019). (dmh)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.. (Lundberg, Paul) (Main Document 4 replaced and regenerated on 6/10/2019). (dmh)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc. (Lundberg, Paul) (Main Document 3 replaced and regenerated on 6/10/2019). (dmh)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to O'Reilly Automotive, Inc.. (Lundberg, Paul) (Main Document 2 replaced and regenerated on 6/10/2019). (dmh)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3838066., filed by Wayne Rupe. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/4/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/4/2019.(Lundberg, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rupe v. O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc
Represented By: Edward Theodore Pivin
Represented By: Dennis P Ogden
Represented By: Thomas P. Berra, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Specialty Packaging, LLC
Represented By: Edward Theodore Pivin
Represented By: Dennis P Ogden
Represented By: Thomas P. Berra, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Theodore Pivin
Represented By: Dennis P Ogden
Represented By: Thomas P. Berra, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Inc
Represented By: Edward Theodore Pivin
Represented By: Dennis P Ogden
Represented By: Thomas P. Berra, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Rupe
Represented By: Paul D Lundberg
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Thomas V. Bender
Represented By: Dirk Leon Hubbard
Represented By: William Lewis Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?