United Educators Insurance v. United Fire & Casualty Company et al

Plaintiff: United Educators Insurance
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Company and United Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00168
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per Notice #8 . (sjc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United Educators Insurance (Chemers, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Educators Insurance. Employers Mutual Casualty Company served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Bush, William)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Educators Insurance. United Fire & Casualty Company served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Bush, William)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Errata this replaces Exhibit K (attachment 11) re #1 Complaint,, filed by United Educators Insurance. (Chemers, Robert)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert Marc Chemers. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/12/2019. (kjw)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3842061 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by United Educators Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supreme Court of IL Certificate of Admission to the Bar of Illinois, #2 Exhibit Electronic Case Filing System Attorney Registration Form)(Chemers, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (sjc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3840542., filed by United Educators Insurance, a Reciprocal Risk Retention Group. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/9/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Bush, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Educators Insurance v. United Fire & Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Educators Insurance
Represented By: William J Bush
Represented By: Robert Marc Chemers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?