Johnson v. Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Mindy L Johnson and Mindy Johnson
Defendant: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp., Vital Recovery Services, LLC and Nissan-Infiniti LT
Case Number: 4:2019cv00173
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Kunert, Mitchell)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Vital Recovery Services, LLC. (Frost, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Vital Recovery Services, LLC.(Frost, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp. answer is due 8/13/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/25/2019. (imk)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Kunert, Mitchell)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell R Kunert on behalf of Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp. (Kunert, Mitchell)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp. by Mindy Johnson.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Marks, Samuel) Modified on 7/26/2019 termed motion(slg).
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Vital Recovery Services, LLC's answer is due 8/6/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/22/2019. (imk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Vital Recovery Services, LLC by Mindy Johnson.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Marks, Samuel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mindy Johnson. Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp. served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Marks, Samuel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mindy Johnson. Vital Recovery Services, LLC served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Marks, Samuel)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1) (slg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp., Vital Recovery Services, LLC Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3847422., filed by Mindy L Johnson. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/16/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/16/2019.(Marks, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp.
Represented By: Mitchell R Kunert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital Recovery Services, LLC
Represented By: Michael L. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan-Infiniti LT
Represented By: Mitchell R Kunert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mindy L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mindy Johnson
Represented By: Samuel Z Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?