Terry v. New Hampshire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Juwan Ellen Terry
Defendant: New Hampshire Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00177
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by New Hampshire Insurance Company. (Aden, Allyson)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by New Hampshire Insurance Company.(Weston, J)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 7/22/2019. (sjc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Hampshire Insurance Company from Appanose County, case number CVEQ005188. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3847787., filed by New Hampshire Insurance Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Table of Contents, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 Local Rule 81a Statement)(Weston, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry v. New Hampshire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hampshire Insurance Company
Represented By: Allyson Fawcett Aden
Represented By: J Michael Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juwan Ellen Terry
Represented By: Matthew R Denning
Represented By: Matthew Denning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?