Lime Lounge, LLC v. City of Des Moines, Iowa et al
Plaintiff: George Qualley, IV, Cornelius Qualley and Lime Lounge, LLC
Defendant: City of Des Moines, Iowa, Suann Donovan, Paul Parizek, Kelly Stuhr, Dana Wingert and Jo Gatto
Case Number: 4:2019cv00182
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: motion hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle. (alb)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER. Hearing on the resisted motion to dismiss (Docket #4) will be held at 10:00 a.m. on 8/29/19 in Room #455 in the U.S. Courthouse in Des Moines. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 8/8/2019. (alb)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM On Claims 1, 2, 4, 8, 9, and 10 filed by Lime Lounge, LLC, Cornelius Qualley, George Qualley, IV. Replies due by 8/13/2019.(Qualley, Cornelius)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Lime Lounge, LLC. (Qualley, Cornelius)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM On Claims 1, 2, 4, 8, 9, and 10 by City of Des Moines, Iowa, Suann Donovan, Jo Gatto, Paul Parizek, Kelly Stuhr, Dana Wingert. Responses due by 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Appendix)(Haraldson, John)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint by City of Des Moines, Iowa, Suann Donovan, Jo Gatto, Paul Parizek, Kelly Stuhr, Dana Wingert.(Haraldson, John)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 7/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (vr)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jo Gatto, Paul Parizek, Suann Donovan, City of Des Moines, Iowa, Kelly Stuhr, Dana Wingert from POLK, case number CVCV058225., filed by Jo Gatto, Paul Parizek, Suann Donovan, City of Des Moines, Iowa, Kelly Stuhr, Dana Wingert. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Rule 81, #2 Original Notice, #3 Amended Petition)(Haraldson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lime Lounge, LLC v. City of Des Moines, Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Des Moines, Iowa
Represented By: John O. Haraldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suann Donovan
Represented By: John O. Haraldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Parizek
Represented By: John O. Haraldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Stuhr
Represented By: John O. Haraldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Wingert
Represented By: John O. Haraldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Gatto
Represented By: John O. Haraldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Qualley, IV
Represented By: Cornelius Qualley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Qualley
Represented By: Cornelius Qualley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lime Lounge, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius Qualley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?