Saunders v. Thies, et al

Plaintiff: Courtney Saunders
Defendant: Dana Wingert, City of Des Moines, Iowa, Kyle Thies and Clint Dee
Case Number: 4:2019cv00191
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983dp
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Kyle Thies.(Goudelock, Gary)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See order for more particulars. Status Conference set for 10/10/2019 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 12/10/2019 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 2/10/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 4/10/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 6/10/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/29/2019. (imk)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/29/2019. (imk)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting #5 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 8/12/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 9/23/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/23/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/21/2019. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 12/23/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 1/20/2020. Discovery Deadline 3/23/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 4/20/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2020 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 460 - 4th Floor North before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 10/5/2020 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 265 - 2nd Floor before Chief Judge John A. Jarvey. Estimated length of 5 days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/29/2019. (imk)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 7/29/2019. Attorney Gina Messamer appeared for plaintiff. Attorney John Haraldson appeared for defendants. Status of case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 10 minutes. (imk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Messamer, Gina)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Scheduling Conference originally set for 7/26/2019 is continued to 7/29/2019 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/18/2019. (imk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. An In-Person Scheduling Conference shall be held on 7/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 7/22/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/28/2019. (imk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Defendants' Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by City of Des Moines, Iowa, Clint Dee, Dana Wingert.(Haraldson, John)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dana Wingert, City of Des Moines, Iowa, Clint Dee, Kyle Thies from Polk County District Court, case number LACL144718. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3853489., filed by Dana Wingert, City of Des Moines, Iowa, Clint Dee, Kyle Thies. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Rule 81 Notice, #2 Exhibit Petition and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit Original Notice Dee, #4 Exhibit Original Notice Thies, #5 Exhibit Original Notice Wingert, #6 Exhibit Acceptance of Service)(Haraldson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. Thies, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Wingert
Represented By: John O. Haraldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Des Moines, Iowa
Represented By: John O. Haraldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Thies
Represented By: John O. Haraldson
Represented By: Gary D Goudelock, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Dee
Represented By: John O. Haraldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Saunders
Represented By: Gina Messamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?