Tumoe v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Daddy Stanley Tumoe
Defendant: David Douglas, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin Mcaleenan, William Barr, Marta Nickols, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services and Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 4:2019cv00194
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1421
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Donels on behalf of Daddy Stanley Tumoe (Donels, Jessica)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daddy Stanley Tumoe as to Def. McAleenan (Donels, Jessica)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daddy Stanley Tumoe as to Def. Nickols (Donels, Jessica)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daddy Stanley Tumoe (Donels, Jessica)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daddy Stanley Tumoe as to Def. Cucinelli (Donels, Jessica)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daddy Stanley Tumoe. All Defendants served on 7/3/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Donels, Jessica) Modified on 7/22/2019 Added service date and answer due date(slg).
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daddy Stanley Tumoe. U.S. Attorney General served on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Bergmann, Benjamin) Modified on 7/22/2019 Corrected Answer due date to 60 days (slg).
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daddy Stanley Tumoe as to Def. William Barr (Donels, Jessica)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons. Note: Counsel should download the attached summons in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure. (slg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND FOR HEARING ON NATURALIZATION APPLICATION against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3855430., filed by Daddy Stanley Tumoe. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/23/2019.(Bergmann, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tumoe v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daddy Stanley Tumoe
Represented By: Benjamin David Bergmann
Represented By: Jessica Donels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Mcaleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marta Nickols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?