United States of America v. $8,623.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $8,623.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 4:2019cv00212
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 ***Warrant returned executed*** NOTICE by United States of America re #3 Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem Executed Warrant of Arrest in Rem (Gaumer, Craig) Modified on 8/27/2019 (kjw).
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 ***Warrant of Arrest in Rem*** ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 8/6/2019. (vr) Modified on 8/9/2019 (kjw).
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. Responses due by 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaumer, Craig)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified for Forfeiture in Rem against $8,623.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 10/11/2019.(Gaumer, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $8,623.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,623.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig P Gaumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?