Carlson v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Ms. Holly Carlson and Holly Carlson
Defendant: Administrator Robert Wilkie and U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 4:2019cv00238
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Fondungallah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 8/16/2019. (slg)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3897372 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Holly Carlson. (Fondungallah, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Holly Carlson. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs served on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Sinkevich, Frederick)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (kmc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Holly Carlson against Robert Wilkie Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3881809., filed by Holly Carlson. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DAB Decision Letter)(Sinkevich, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrator Robert Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Holly Carlson
Represented By: Frederick Adam Sinkevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Carlson
Represented By: Frederick Adam Sinkevich
Represented By: Michael Ajiawung Fondungallah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?