Angle Hans Enterprises, L.C. v. Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Angle Hans Enterprises, L.C.
Defendant: Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00253
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/1/2019. (jeb)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Jury Trial set to begin 12/7/2020 9:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse Room 145 before Judge Stephanie M. Rose for estimated 4 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2020 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Initial Disclosures due by 11/1/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 12/2/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/2/2019. Plaintiff Expert Witness Disclosures due by 1/15/2020. Defendant Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/16/2020. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 4/15/2020. Discovery Deadline 6/1/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 7/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/1/2019. (jeb)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/1/2019. Attorney Paul Peglow appeared for plaintiff. Attorneys Laura Hanson & Kathleen Reitz appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Total Court Time: 11 minutes. (jeb)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Peglow, Paul)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT ON ESI by Angle Hans Enterprises, L.C.. (Peglow, Paul)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on October 1, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by September 27, 2019. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 9/19/2019. (jeb)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint Petition at Law by Federated Mutual Insurance Company.(Hanson, Laura)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Angle Hans Enterprises, L.C.. (Peglow, Paul)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Answer Due Date. As requested, defendant shall have until September 6, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 8/20/2019. (jeb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Federated Mutual Insurance Company.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Hanson, Laura)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 9/3/2019. (kmc)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Laura Hanson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 8/14/2019. (slg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3894699 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Reitz, Kathleen)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Reitz, Kathleen)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federated Mutual Insurance Company from District Court for Marshall County, case number LACI010412. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3894310., filed by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1-2 to Reitz Affidavit)(Reitz, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angle Hans Enterprises, L.C. v. Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angle Hans Enterprises, L.C.
Represented By: Paul Campbell Peglow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen Li Reitz
Represented By: Laura Jean Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?