Biggart v. United States of America
Petitioner: Anthony Cordaro Biggart
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00257
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Anthony Biggart which included #5 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Updated user account with correct prison address and re-mailed to petitioner at Oklahoma City FTC. (slg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J Dunn on behalf of Anthony Cordaro Biggart (Dunn, Andrew)
August 28, 2019 ***CJA Attorney Appointment accepted by Attorney Andrew J Dunn for Anthony Cordaro Biggart. (vr)
August 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Government Brief due by 10/28/2019. Plaintiff Reply Brief due by 11/25/2019. (slg)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. The Government shall file either an answer or brief in response to Movant's section 2255 motion, #1 #3 , by no later than October 28, 2019. Movant shall respond by no later than November 25, 2019. The Court grants #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel and directs the Clerk of Court to identify such counsel to represent Movant. See attached Order for particulars. A copy of this Order has been mailed to Movant at Beaumont, U.S. Penitentiary, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. Box 26030, Beaumont, TX 77720. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 8/27/2019. (jch)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Supplement by Anthony Cordaro Biggart re #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (slg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT by Anthony Cordaro Biggart re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (slg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Anthony Cordaro Biggart. Responses due by 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Inmate account statement) (kjw)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Anthony Cordaro Biggart. Filed from criminal case 1-13-cr-55 per staff attorney. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (kjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biggart v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Cordaro Biggart
Represented By: Andrew J Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?