Henning Construction Company, LLC v. Amerisure Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Henning Construction Company, LLC
Defendant: Amerisure Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00259
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Henning Construction Company, LLC. (Lantz, Todd)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Amerisure Insurance Company.(Thomas, Janice)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Amerisure Insurance Company DEFENDANT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION AND LOCAL RULE 81 STATEMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Thomas, Janice)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Amerisure Insurance Company. Amended Notice of Removal due by September 3, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 8/23/2019. (klw)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Elaine Moss. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/22/2019. (slg)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3902844 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Amerisure Insurance Company. (Thomas, Janice)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Amerisure Insurance Company. (Thomas, Janice)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 9/20/2019. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 9/20/2019. (sjc)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amerisure Insurance Company from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL145152., filed by Amerisure Insurance Company. Filing fee paid in the amount of $400, receipt number IAS400021611. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Thomas, Janice) Modified on 8/20/2019, added payment information (kjw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henning Construction Company, LLC v. Amerisure Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henning Construction Company, LLC
Represented By: Todd M. Lantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisure Insurance Company
Represented By: Janice M Thomas
Represented By: Elaine Marie Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?