Fareway Stores, Inc. v Adlife Marketing & Communication Co., Inc
Plaintiff: Fareway Stores, Inc.
Defendant: Adlife Marketing Communications Co., Inc and Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00263
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 16 REPORT REGARDING COPYRIGHT mailed to registrar. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (kmc)
February 25, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. See #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (kmc)
February 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fareway Stores, Inc. (Collins, Robert)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative transfer the case to the Central District of Illinois filed by Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan E. Carreon)(Carreon, Ryan)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert M. Collins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 10/24/2019. (kjw)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3957420 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Fareway Stores, Inc.. (Collins, Robert)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 ***DECLARATION OF LYNN GEERDES*** RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative transfer the case to the Central District of Illinois Declaration of Lynn Geerdes in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Fareway Stores, Inc.. Replies due by 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B to Declaration of Lynn Geerdes)(Geerdes, Lynn) Modified on 10/23/2019 (slg).
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative transfer the case to the Central District of Illinois filed by Fareway Stores, Inc.. Replies due by 10/29/2019.(Geerdes, Lynn)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ryan E. Carreon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 10/7/2019. (kjw)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative transfer the case to the Central District of Illinois by Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc. Responses due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan E. Carreon)(Carreon, Ryan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3942397 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc. (Carreon, Ryan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles H Fagen on behalf of All Defendants (Fagen, Charles)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fareway Stores, Inc.. Fareway Stores, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Geerdes, Lynn)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Fareway Stores, Inc.. (Geerdes, Lynn)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT REGARDING COPYRIGHT mailed to registrar. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (kmc)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 LR 7.1 Packet) (kmc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COPYRIGHT/PATENT/TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against Adlife Marketing Communication Co., Inc filed by Fareway Stores, Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/21/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint for Declaratory Relief Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2201 (Copyright Act), #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint for Declaratory Relief Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2201 (Copyright Act), #3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint for Declaratory Relief Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2201 (Copyright Act), #4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint for Declaratory Relief Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2201 (Copyright Act), #5 Exhibit 5 to Complaint for Declaratory Relief Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2201 (Copyright Act), #6 Exhibit 6 to Complaint for Declaratory Relief Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2201 (Copyright Act))(Geerdes, Lynn) Modified on 8/23/2019 Receipt #0863-3904321 $400.00(don).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fareway Stores, Inc. v Adlife Marketing & Communication Co., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fareway Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn Marie Geerdes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adlife Marketing Communications Co., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc
Represented By: Charles H Fagen
Represented By: Ryan Evan Carreon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?