BNSF Railway Company v. United Metallurgical Company et al
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Defendant: Vyksa Steel Works and United Metallurgical Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00277
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: John A Jarvey
Referring Judge: Ross A Walters(R)
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332lp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BNSF Railway Company. Vyksa Steel Works served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Sikes, Richard)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BNSF Railway Company. United Metallurgical Company served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Sikes, Richard)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by BNSF Railway Company. (Sikes, Richard)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard T. Sikes, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 9/6/2019. (slg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BNSF Railway Company. (Sikes, Richard) Modified on 9/6/2019 $100.00 paid receipt #0863-3915464 (slg).
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Packet) (sjc)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3913872., filed by BNSF Railway Company. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/4/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/4/2019.(Kunert, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNSF Railway Company v. United Metallurgical Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vyksa Steel Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Metallurgical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Mitchell R Kunert
Represented By: Richard T. Sikes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?