Etchen v. Corteva, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kenneth Mark Etchen
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00293
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
2 Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331ag
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER re #13 Order. A Status Conference is set for 9:30 a.m. on February 4, 2020, by telephone. Counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731 at the prompt. By 4:00 p.m. on January 31, 2020, counsel shall file a joint agenda. If there are no issues to be discussed, counsel may request the Status Conference be canceled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 11/7/2019. (mlr)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Five-day jury trial set before the Honorable John A. Jarvey beginning at 9:00 a.m. on February 8, 2021, at the U.S. Courthouse in Des Moines,Iowa. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10:00 a.m. on January 27, 2021, before the Honorable Celeste F. Bremer at the U.S. Courthouse in Des Moines, Iowa. See Order #13 for instructions to the parties regarding requirements for Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 11/7/2019. (mlr)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting #10 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Five-day Jury Trial set for 2/8/2021 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 265 - 2nd Floor before Chief Judge John A. Jarvey. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2021 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 435 - 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Status Conference set for 2/4/2020 09:30 AM in Phone Hearing. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731. A Joint Agenda due by 4:00 p.m. on January 31, 2019. See Order for details. Initial Disclosures Deadline 12/13/2019. S Motions to Add Parties due by 2/7/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/7/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/6/2020. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 5/1/2020. Discovery Deadline 6/5/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 6/5/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 7/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 11/7/2019. (mlr)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Order granting #11 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 11/6/2019. (mlr)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Corteva, Inc..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Elgin, Susan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Elgin, Susan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Corteva, Inc.. (Elgin, Susan)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mitchell Garrett Nass terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/2/2019. (mlr)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Corteva, Inc..Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 10/15/2019. (Nass, Mitchell)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Corteva, Inc..(Elgin, Susan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Filing by Corteva, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(Nass, Mitchell)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Corteva, Inc.., filed by Kenneth Mark Etchen.(Fiedler-Carlson, Madison)
September 13, 2019 Chief Judge John A. Jarvey added. Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt no longer assigned to case. (slg)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 10/3/2019. (slg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE by Corteva, Inc.. (Nass, Mitchell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Corteva, Inc. from Polk County District Court, case number LACL145352. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3920187., filed by Corteva, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nass, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Etchen v. Corteva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell Garrett Nass
Represented By: Michael A Giudicessi
Represented By: Susan Patricia Elgin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Mark Etchen
Represented By: Paige Ellen Fiedler
Represented By: Madison Elizabeth Fiedler-Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?