Lampe v. United States of America
Petitioner: Philip Jason Lampe
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00304
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of USCA to submit documents as to #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Philip Jason Lampe. (vr)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 USCA Case Number 19-3305 for #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Philip Jason Lampe. (vr)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA Supplement by District Court Clerk to USCA re #5 Notice of Appeal filed on 10/21/2019. (vr)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Order and #3 Judgment by Philip Jason Lampe. (rmj)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford R Cronk, III on behalf of United States of America (Cronk, Clifford)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Philip Jason Lampe. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 9/30/2019. (slg)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. The Court concludes the files and records of this and Movant's criminal case plainly demonstrate he is not entitled to relief. Movant's section 2255 motion is DENIED, and the case is DISMISSED. Movant's request for appointment of counsel is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 9/27/2019. (jch)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Philip Jason Lampe. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (kjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lampe v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Philip Jason Lampe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Clifford R Cronk, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?