Clay v. United States of America
Petitioner: Anthony Dwayne Clay
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00311
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Anthony Dwayne Clay. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 11/22/2019. (slg)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT by Anthony Dwayne Clay (slg)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER dismissing #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Anthony Dwayne Clay, denying #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Anthony Dwayne Clay. The Court grants a certificate of appealability. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 11/21/2019. (ggp)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D Westphal on behalf of United States of America (Westphal, Richard)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Anthony Dwayne Clay. Responses due by 10/11/2019. (slg) Modified on 11/22/2019 Termed motion (slg).
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Anthony Dwayne Clay. (slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clay v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Dwayne Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Richard D Westphal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?