Rasmusson v. Monsanto Company, Inc.,
Plaintiff: Ted Charles Rasmusson
Defendant: Monsanto Company, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00325
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1407pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 Errata Proof of Service Summons re #5 Summons Returned Executed filed by Ted Charles Rasmusson. (Bartusek, Amanda)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer is due by 12/11/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/19/2019. (imk)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Monsanto Company, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Reif, Rebecca)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ted Charles Rasmusson. Monsanto Company, Inc. served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Bartusek, Amanda)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE TO COUNSEL - The Clerk of the Panel has determined the listed action(s) is not appropriate for inclusion in this MDL. See Rule 7.1(b)(i).-- IAS/4:19-cv-00325Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 10/10/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2741, IAS/4:19-cv-00325 (TLL) (kjw)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Letter MDL Panel regarding potential tag-along action. Emailed letter, complaint and docket sheet to panel. (don)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company, Inc. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3943652., filed by Ted Charles Rasmusson. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/6/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/6/2020.(Bartusek, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasmusson v. Monsanto Company, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Charles Rasmusson
Represented By: Amanda Marie Bartusek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?