Neogen Corporation v. Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC
Plaintiff: Neogen Corporation
Defendant: Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00330
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 54 ANSWER to #48 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Neogen Corporation.(Chalik, Peter)
December 2, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss Count I by Neogen Corporation. Responses due by 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Chalik, Peter)
November 13, 2019 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC. (Kahler, Brant)
November 11, 2019 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Neogen Corporation. (Chalik, Peter)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TEXT ORDER granting #49 unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to December 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 11/7/2019. (mlr)
November 7, 2019 Filing 49 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Neogen Corporation.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 11/21/2019. (Chalik, Peter)
October 28, 2019 Filing 48 IRT's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM Neogen Corporation against Neogen Corporation by Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC.(Kahler, Brant)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dennis J. Levasseur; granting #46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Megan R.I. Baxter-Labut. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/23/2019. (kjw)
October 23, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3956742 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC. (Baxter-Labut, Megan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3956686 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC. (Levasseur, Dennis)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The deadline to file a Responsive Pleading is extended from October 23, 2019 to October 28, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/23/2019. (keh)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam M. Wenner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/22/2019. (kjw)
October 22, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 11/5/2019. (Kahler, Brant)
October 22, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3955877 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Neogen Corporation. (Wenner, Adam)
October 21, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Brant D. Kahler on behalf of Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC (Kahler, Brant)
October 21, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Chalik on behalf of Neogen Corporation (Chalik, Peter)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice J. Michael Huget. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/18/2019. (slg)
October 18, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3953709 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Neogen Corporation. (Huget, J.)
October 17, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D Jacobson on behalf of Neogen Corporation (Jacobson, Matthew)
October 11, 2019 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS/PRO SE PARTY: Your case has been opened in the SDIA and assigned a new case number. Please review the attached document and forms for compliance with this Court's Local Rules. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/9/2020. (kjw)
October 10, 2019 Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger and Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer added. (don)
October 10, 2019 Filing 34 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Western; Case Number 1:18-cv-00789. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 OPINION AND ORDER granting #28 motion to dismiss or, in the Alternative to Transfer; this matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Iowa, Central Division; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
May 7, 2019 Filing 32 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Withdraw of Appearance of Maria L. Martinez by defendant Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC (Levasseur, Dennis)
April 2, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Maria L. Martinez on behalf of defendant Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC (Martinez, Maria)
March 28, 2019 Filing 31 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Withdraw the Appearance of Michael J. Serra by defendant Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC (Serra, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to response to motion #28 to dismiss or, in the alternative, to transfer venue filed by Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Levasseur, Dennis)
March 8, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss or in the Alternative, To Transfer Venue #28 filed by Neogen Corporation (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - LinkedIn Page, #4 Exhibit C - 8/28/17 Email, #5 Exhibit D - 3/31/17 Termination Letter, #6 Exhibit E - 6/29/17 Letter, #7 Exhibit F - 2017 Purchase Orders, #8 Exhibit G - 3/1/18 Letter, #9 Exhibit H - 3/5/18 Email, #10 Exhibit I - 3/14/18 Letter, #11 Exhibit J - 4/22/18 Letter, #12 Exhibit K - 4/23-24/18 Emails, #13 Exhibit L - 6/5/18 Letter, #14 Exhibit M - 11/8/17 Email) (Huget, J.)
March 8, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to dismiss or in the Alternative, To Transfer Venue by defendant Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC; (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Levasseur, Dennis) Modified text on 3/11/2019 (mg).
March 8, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC for service of reply brief on plaintiff's counsel per Judge's Order (dkt #24) (Levasseur, Dennis)
February 22, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Neogen Corporation for Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, To Transfer Venue, Certificate of Compliance (Huget, J.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC for service of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, To Transfer Venue (Levasseur, Dennis)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER setting forth the briefing schedule re anticipated motion to dismiss; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
January 17, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE TO SECOND REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC #20 ; filed by Neogen Corporation filed by Neogen Corporation (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A - NDA, #3 Exhibit B - 2017-06-29 Letter, #4 Exhibit C - 2018-03-01 Letter, #5 Exhibit D - 2018-06-05 Letter) (Huget, J.)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 motion for extension of time; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
January 10, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 complaint or otherwise respond by defendant Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC; (Levasseur, Dennis)
January 10, 2019 Filing 20 SECOND REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC (Levasseur, Dennis)
January 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE re #15 Joint Notice Regarding Mediation by plaintiff Neogen Corporation (Wenner, Adam)
December 28, 2018 Filing 18 REPORT of facilitative mediation held 12/17/2018; mediation is Complete; (Silver, Lee)
November 5, 2018 VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 206984 as to defendant Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC (lep)
November 2, 2018 VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 308224 as to plaintiff Neogen Corporation (lep)
October 26, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Lee T. Silver ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 11/2/2018 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 11/2/2018 (lep)
October 24, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE re #15 of Selection of Facilitative Mediator by plaintiff Neogen Corporation (Huget, J.)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE ORDER; defendant's request for a briefing schedule is DENIED without prejudice; this matter shall be submitted to facilitative mediation; Joint Notice due not later than January 8, 2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
October 10, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTES of pre-motion conference re #9 held before Judge Janet T. Neff (Court Reporter: Kathy Anderson) (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER scheduling a pre-motion conference regarding document number #9 : pre-motion conference is set for 10/10/2018 at 01:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 11, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC #9 and Certificate of Service ; filed by Neogen Corporation filed by Neogen Corporation (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A-Mutual Confidentiality & Non-Disclosure Agreement, #3 Exhibit B-First Amendment to Confidentiality & Non-Disclosure Agreement) (Huget, J.)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion for extension of time; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time to File a Responsive Pleading by defendant Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC; (Levasseur, Dennis)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC (Levasseur, Dennis)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting STIPULATION #7 ; Defendant shall have until 9/21/2018 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 25, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding time to responsd to complaint by plaintiff Neogen Corporation (Huget, J.) Modified text on 7/26/2018 (mg).
July 25, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Shirin Savliwala Goyal on behalf of plaintiff Neogen Corporation (Goyal, Shirin)
July 25, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC served on 7/20/2018, answer due 8/10/2018 (Huget, J.)
July 25, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael Joseph Serra on behalf of defendant Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC (Serra, Michael)
July 25, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Dennis J. Levasseur on behalf of defendant Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC (Levasseur, Dennis)
July 24, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Adam Michael Wenner on behalf of plaintiff Neogen Corporation (Wenner, Adam)
July 18, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC (mg)
July 18, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Huget, J.)
July 18, 2018 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC (none provided) (mg)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (mg)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Neogen Corporation (Huget, J.)
July 17, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Neogen Corporation in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4184194 (Huget, J.)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC filed by Neogen Corporation (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A. Exclusive Supply Agreement, #3 Exhibit B. March 31, 2017 Supply Agreement Termination Letter, #4 Exhibit C. February 28, 2018 Letter from IRT re Catheter Production Issues, #5 Exhibit D. May 21, 2018 Payment Demand Letter to IRT, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Huget, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neogen Corporation v. Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Reproduction Technology, LLC
Represented By: Maria L. Martinez
Represented By: Dennis J. Levasseur
Represented By: Michael Joseph Serra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neogen Corporation
Represented By: Shirin Savliwala Goyal
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?