Emrit v. National Football League et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: Washington Redskins, Daniel Snyder and National Football League
Case Number: 4:2019cv00334
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Satish Emrit. (slg)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE Summons and Marshall 285 form by Ronald Satish Emrit. (slg)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 10/17/2019. (alb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Satish Emrit. (kjw)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Football League, Daniel Snyder, Washington Redskins, filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/13/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/13/2020. (kjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. National Football League et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Redskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?