Tucker v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Rakisha Tucker
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2019cv00339
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 24 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 12/19/2019. Attorney Gregory Rueb appeared for plaintiff. Attorneys Gregory Lederer and John Gearan appeared for defendants. Scheduling Order deadlines will not be determined until after the parties' disputes regarding the scope of discovery are resolved. Total Court Time: 5 minutes. (imk)
December 16, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Lindenfeld, Noah) Modified on 12/17/2019 corrected event (slg).
December 9, 2019 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties shall file the Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by December 16, 2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/9/2019. (imk)
December 9, 2019 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 12/23/2019. (Lederer, Gregory)
November 19, 2019 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on 12/19/2019 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16, and specifically discussed at todays status conference, by 12/9/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/19/2019. (imk)
November 19, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Status Conference held on 11/19/2019. Attorney Gregory Rueb appeared for plaintiff. Attorneys Gregory Lederer, Allyson Aden, and John Gearan appeared for defendants. Total Court Time: 30 minutes. (imk)
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference shall be held on 11/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. Counsel outside of Iowa may attend telephonically. If they choose to do so, counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/6/2019.(slg)
November 5, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory Rueb. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/5/2019. (kjw)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3966266 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Gregory Rueb. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Standing)(Prichard, Todd)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 *** Notice of Apperance*** MOTION to add party by Todd P Prichard.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 11/15/2019. (Prichard, Todd) Modified on 11/4/2019 (kjw).
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lindenfeld, Noah)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Noah Lindenfeld; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John S. Gearan; granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John K. Wells. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 10/29/2019. (slg)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lederer, Gregory)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lederer, Gregory)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lindenfeld, Noah)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson Fawcett Aden on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Aden, Allyson)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Withdrawal of Appearance of Richard B. North, Jr. by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 11/7/2019. (Lederer, Gregory)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated Notice Regarding MDL Counsel for Defendants (Lederer, Gregory)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M Lederer on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Lederer, Gregory)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS/PRO SE PARTY: Your case has been opened in the SDIA and assigned a new case number. Please review the attached document and forms for compliance with this Court's Local Rules. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/21/2020. (slg)
October 23, 2019 Judge Stephanie M. Rose and Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. (slg)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02179. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 23, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Southern District of Iowa via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Second) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (MAP)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-2179-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16737579 filed by Rakisha Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Represented By: John K. Wells
Represented By: Allyson Fawcett Aden
Represented By: Noah Lindenfeld
Represented By: John S. Gearan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Represented By: John K. Wells
Represented By: Allyson Fawcett Aden
Represented By: Noah Lindenfeld
Represented By: John S. Gearan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rakisha Tucker
Represented By: John A Dalimonte
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Represented By: Todd P Prichard
Represented By: Gregory David Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?