Weiss-Kreps v. Wilkie
Plaintiff: Kelly Weiss-Kreps
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 4:2019cv00348
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: James E Gritzner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Weiss-Kreps. United States Department of Veterans Affairs served on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Sinkevich, Frederick)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Weiss-Kreps. United States Department of Veterans Affairs served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Sinkevich, Frederick) Modified on 11/6/2019 See entry #7 (slg).
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kelly Weiss-Kreps on Robert Wilkie Secretary of the US, Dept. of VA (Sinkevich, Frederick) Modified on 11/6/2019 See entry #7 (slg).
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Ajiawung Fondungallah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/30/2019. (slg)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3963410 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Kelly Weiss-Kreps. (Fondungallah, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure. (sjc)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Wilkie Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3961977., filed by Kelly Weiss-Kreps. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits-Redacted, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Sinkevich, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weiss-Kreps v. Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Weiss-Kreps
Represented By: Frederick Adam Sinkevich
Represented By: Michael Ajiawung Fondungallah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?