McNeal et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Rita McNeal and Cliff McNeal
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00360
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/20/2019. (jeb)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Jury Trial set to begin 5/17/2021 9:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse Room 455 before Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt for an estimated 5 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2021 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Initial Disclosures due by 2/10/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 3/18/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/18/2020. Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Disclosures due by 4/16/2020. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 6/17/2020. Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 7/17/2020. Discovery Deadline 9/16/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 10/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/20/2019. (jeb)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Pursuant to Local Rule 83(d)(6), attorney Christopher Stewart shall be allowed to withdraw as counsel and is relieved of his duties in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/19/2019. (jeb)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/19/2019. Attorney Matthew Sease appeared for plaintiffs. Attorney J Michael Weston appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Court Time: 10 minutes. (jeb)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Weston, J) Modified on 12/12/2019 Corrected event (slg).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on December 19, 2019, at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by December 17, 2019. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/10/2019. (jeb)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Sease on behalf of Cliff McNeal, Rita McNeal (Sease, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Weston, J)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 11/29/2019. (slg)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cliff McNeal, Rita McNeal. Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 11/21/2019. (Hearing was set in State Court for 11/12/2019 on motion) (kjw)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company d/b/a State Farm from Wapello County, case number LALA105990. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3970849., filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company d/b/a State Farm. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 LR 81.a Statement)(Weston, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita McNeal
Represented By: Christopher Stewart
Represented By: Matthew Sease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cliff McNeal
Represented By: Christopher Stewart
Represented By: Matthew Sease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Weston
Represented By: J Michael Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?