Greek House Chefs, Inc. v. Upper Crust Food Service, LLC
Plaintiff: Greek House Chefs, Inc.
Defendant: Upper Crust Food Service, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00063
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Greek House Chefs, Inc.. (Kennedy, Jonathan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark numbers 5,981,062; 5,755,925; 4,247,656. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (slg)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 3/13/2020. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 3/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Upper Crust Food Service, LLC Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4067413., filed by Greek House Chefs, Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/21/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration No. 5,981,062, #2 Exhibit Registration No. 5,755,925, #3 Exhibit Registration No. 4,247,656, #4 Exhibit September 2018 Letter, #5 Exhibit September 2018 Letter, #6 Exhibit Website, #7 Exhibit November 2019 Letter, #8 Exhibit December 2019 Letter)(Kennedy, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greek House Chefs, Inc. v. Upper Crust Food Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greek House Chefs, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Lee Kennedy
Represented By: Glenn L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upper Crust Food Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?