Medeiros v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Sheryl Medeiros
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00124
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. Status Conferences set for 8/18/2020 11:00 AM, 10/14/2020 11:00 AM, 12/14/2020 11:00 AM, 2/8/2021 11:00 AM in Phone Hearings(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/22/2020. (imk) Modified on 5/26/2020 removed text (slg).
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/22/2020. (imk)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER adopting #8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 5/21/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 7/10/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/10/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/11/2020. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/12/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 11/11/2020. Discovery Deadline 1/11/2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline 6/4/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2021 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 460 - 4th Floor North before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 460 - 4th Floor North before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Estimated length of four days.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/22/2020. (imk)
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 5/22/2020. Attorney Chad Knapp appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Kerrie Murphy appeared for defendants. Status of case discussed. Separate Orders to follow. Total Court Time: 12 minutes. (imk)
May 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Sheryl Medeiros of Serving Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Knapp, Chad)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Protective Order. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/20/2020. (imk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Walmart Inc.. Responses due by 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Protective Order)(Murphy, Kerrie)
May 19, 2020 Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added as Presiding Judge. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams as referral and Judge Stephanie M. Rose no longer assigned to case. (kmc)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Order re #8 Consent To Proceed Before A Magistrate. It is ORDERED that this case is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to the consent of the parties to conduct all further proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 5/18/2020. (mkh)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Knapp, Chad)
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER. The parties' proposed scheduling order and discovery plan has not been filed in accordance with the Court's Order 4 . The parties must get their proposed scheduling order and discovery plan on file by 5/19/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/18/2020. (imk)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Walmart Inc. re Serving Initial Disclosures on Plaintiff (Murphy, Kerrie)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Walmart Inc.. (Murphy, Kerrie)
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on 5/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 5/15/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/21/2020. (imk)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart Inc..(Murphy, Kerrie)
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 5/8/2020. (kmc)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL147546. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4108666., filed by Walmart Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Kerrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medeiros v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Medeiros
Represented By: Chad F Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Kerrie M. Murphy
Represented By: Julie Tomka Bittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?