Pederson v. Windstream Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Jennifer Pederson
Defendant: Windstream Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00161
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441fm
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for more particulars. Status Conferences set for 10/16/2020 11:00 AM, 12/11/2020 11:00 AM, 2/26/2021 11:00 AM, 4/19/2021 11:00 AM, 5/25/2021 11:00 AM all are in Phone Hearings(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearings will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/22/2020. (imk) Modified on 6/23/2020 removed additional text (slg).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/22/2020. (imk)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting #6 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 7/1/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 8/1/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/1/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/1/2020. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 11/1/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 12/1/2020. Discovery Deadline 5/1/2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline 6/1/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 460 - 4th Floor North before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 11/8/2021 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 265 - 2nd Floor before Chief Judge John A. Jarvey. Estimated length of five days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/22/2020. (imk)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 6/22/2020. Attorney Harley Erbe appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Martha Shaff appeared for defendant. Status of case discussed. Separate Orders to follow. Total Court Time: 9 minutes. (imk)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER RE: Scheduling Conference. Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2020 at 10:00 AM will instead take place at 9:00 AM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/15/2020. (imk)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 Designation of Expert Witnesses by Jennifer L. Pederson. (Erbe, Harley)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Erbe, Harley)
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on 6/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 6/15/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/28/2020. (imk)
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Windstream Services, LLC. (Shaff, Martha)
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Windstream Services, LLC.(Shaff, Martha)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 6/10/2020. (slg)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Windstream Services, LLC from Iowa District Court in and for Jasper County, case number LACV121996. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4141683., filed by Windstream Services, LLC. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Shaff, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pederson v. Windstream Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Pederson
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windstream Services, LLC
Represented By: Martha L Shaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?