Petefish v. Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Petefish
Defendant: Donald Farmer and Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00174
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1446lb
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert Petefish; (Arato, Benjamin)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE by Robert Petefish (Frederick T. Harris) of Acceptance of Service on behalf of Donald Farmer (Arato, Benjamin) Modified on 7/30/2020 Emailed counsel to file as waiver of service (slg).
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/23/2020. Attorney Benjamin Arato appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Frederick Harris appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Court Time: 20 minutes. (jeb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Robert Kappelman on behalf of Werner Enterprises, Inc. (Kappelman, Jeffrey)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on July 23, 2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 7/16/2020. (jeb)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Woodard, Grant)
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Granfield Arato on behalf of Robert Petefish (Arato, Benjamin)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven P Wandro on behalf of Robert Petefish (Wandro, Steven)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Woodard on behalf of Robert Petefish (Woodard, Grant)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Redinbaugh, Aaron)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Werner Enterprises, Inc..(Redinbaugh, Aaron)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 6/25/2020. (slg)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Werner Enterprises, Inc. from Clarke County, case number LACV012678. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4152647., filed by Werner Enterprises, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Redinbaugh, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petefish v. Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Jason Redinbaugh
Represented By: Frederick T Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Petefish
Represented By: Anna M. Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?