Arias v. Cactus Family Farms, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Rigoberto Arias
Defendant: Cactus Farms, LLC and Cactus Family Farms, L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00177
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 20 Defendants' ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Cactus Family Farms, L.L.C..(Smid, Danielle)
July 7, 2020 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth A. Chermel Bones; granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice BonesShawn D. Twing. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/7/2020. (kjw)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for more particulars. Status Conferences set for 10/7/2020 11:30 AM, 12/16/2020 11:30 AM, 2/24/2021 11:30 AM and 4/19/2021 11:30 AM in Phone Hearings(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearings will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/7/2020. (imk) Modified on 7/8/2020 removed additional text (slg).
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/7/2020. (imk)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER adopting #9 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 7/30/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 9/25/2020. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/25/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/23/2020. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 12/18/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 1/18/2021. Discovery Deadline 2/26/2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline 3/26/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2021 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 160- 1st Floor North before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Jury Trial set for 9/20/2021 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 160- 1st Floor North before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Estimated length of five days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/7/2020. (imk)
July 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4181405 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Cactus Family Farms, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Twing, Shawn)
July 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4181392 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Cactus Family Farms, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Chermel Bones, Elizabeth)
July 7, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 7/7/2020. Attorney Madison Fiedler-Carlson appeared for plaintiff. Attorneys Danielle Smid and Shawn Twing (who has not filed an appearance in this case) appeared for defendant. Status of case discussed. Plaintiff specifically indicated that a jury demand was included in their complaint. Separate Orders to follow. Total Court Time: 13 minutes. (imk)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Protective Order. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/6/2020. (imk)
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Rigoberto Arias.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Joint Proposed Protective Order)(Fiedler-Carlson, Madison)
June 30, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cactus Family Farms, L.L.C., filed by Rigoberto Arias. (slg)
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Attachments: #1 Attachment "A", #2 Joint Motion for Protective Order, #3 Joint Proposed Protective Order)(Fiedler-Carlson, Madison) Modified on 6/30/2020 Informed counsel to filed the motion for protective order separately (slg).
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff may file their amended complaint. The Clerk shall detach and file the amended complaint filed at ECF No. [6-1]. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/29/2020. (imk)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Cactus Farms, LLC. (Smid, Danielle)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Complaint by Rigoberto Arias.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 7/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Fiedler-Carlson, Madison)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR - SEE ENTRY #7 *** Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Cactus Farms, LLC. (Smid, Danielle) Modified on 6/29/2020 (slg).
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on 7/7/2020 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 6/30/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/15/2020. (imk)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Cactus Farms, LLC.(Smid, Danielle)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 6/26/2020. (slg)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cactus Farms, LLC from Iowa District Court for Clarke County, case number LACV012760. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4154213., filed by Cactus Farms, LLC. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Clarke County District Court Filings)(Smid, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arias v. Cactus Family Farms, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cactus Farms, LLC
Represented By: Danielle D Smid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cactus Family Farms, L.L.C.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Chermel Bones
Represented By: Danielle D. Smid
Represented By: Shawn D. Twing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigoberto Arias
Represented By: Madison Elizabeth Fiedler-Carlson
Represented By: David Ronald Albrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?