The Kessler Enterprise, Inc. v. The Bohemian IC, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Kessler Enterprise, Inc.
Defendant: The Bohemian IC, LLC and Angela Harrington
Case Number: 4:2020cv00230
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Dismissal) (slg)
August 17, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (slg)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by The Kessler Enterprise, Inc. (Ragland, William)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by The Kessler Enterprise, Inc.. Responses due by 8/28/2020. (Ragland, William)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William M. Ragland, Jr.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/27/2020. (kjw)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4200938 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by The Kessler Enterprise, Inc.. (Ragland, William)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 8/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 2,324,739; 3,962,938; 3,706,762; 3,699,745. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (slg)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4198521., filed by The Kessler Enterprise, Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 10/21/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dee, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Kessler Enterprise, Inc. v. The Bohemian IC, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Kessler Enterprise, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Dee
Represented By: William M. Ragland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bohemian IC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?