Paxton v. United States of America
Petitioner: Shannon Lee Paxton
Respondent: United States of America
Interested Party: Gerald Feuerhelm
Case Number: 4:2020cv00262
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Gerald B. Feuerhelm re: In Response to Paxton's Pro Se Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion To Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Gerald Feuerhelm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Enhancement Information)(Feuerhelm, Gerald)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 Governments RESPONSE to 2255 Motion to Vacate by Mikaela J. Shotwell on behalf of United States of America. (Shotwell, Mikaela)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mikaela J. Shotwell on behalf of United States of America (Shotwell, Mikaela)
August 26, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Government Brief due by 10/23/2020. Responses due by 11/23/2020. (slg)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. The Clerk shall serve service of process on Respondent. Respondent shall file a response on or before October 23, 2020. Movant may file a reply brief on or before November 23, 2020. Trial counsel shall file an affidavit responding to the allegations by October 9, 2020. A copy of this Order was mailed to Movant by Chambers. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 8/25/2020. (NDC) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/26/2020) (NDC).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Shannon Lee Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Cover Letter) (kjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paxton v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Mikaela J. Shotwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shannon Lee Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Gerald Feuerhelm
Represented By: Gerald B. Feuerhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?