Graco Inc et al v. Smart Spray LLC
Plaintiff: Graco Inc, Graco Minnesota Inc. and Graco Inc.
Defendant: Smart Spray LLC and Smart Connect LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00264
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on October 28, 2020 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by October 23, 2020. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/15/2020. (jeb)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 10/8/2020. (kjw)
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Plaintiff's Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Smart Spray LLC.(Zarley, Timothy)
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 Errata re #11 Response to Motion filed by Graco Inc.. (Olson, Rajin)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Graco Inc.. Replies due by 10/5/2020.(Olson, Rajin)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Smart Spray LLC. Responses due by 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Motion to Dismiss)(Zarley, Timothy)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Graco Inc, Graco Minnesota Inc.. Smart Spray LLC served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Graham, Wesley)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rajin S. Olson; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William E. Manske; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christopher K. Larus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 8/24/2020. (kjw)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4226285 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Graco Inc, Graco Minnesota Inc.. (Larus, Christopher)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4226270 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Graco Inc, Graco Minnesota Inc.. (Manske, William)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4226248 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Graco Inc, Graco Minnesota Inc.. (Olson, Rajin)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Graco Inc, Graco Minnesota Inc.. (Graham, Wesley)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 9/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 9,929,822. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (slg)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COPYRIGHT/PATENT/TRADEMARK COMPLAINT JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Smart Spray LLC Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4224014., filed by Graco Inc, Graco Minnesota Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/18/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Graham, Wesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graco Inc et al v. Smart Spray LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smart Spray LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Zarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smart Connect LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Zarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graco Inc
Represented By: Wesley T. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graco Minnesota Inc.
Represented By: Wesley T. Graham
Represented By: Christopher K. Larus
Represented By: Rajin S. Olson
Represented By: William E. Manske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graco Inc.
Represented By: Wesley T. Graham
Represented By: Christopher K. Larus
Represented By: Rajin S. Olson
Represented By: William E. Manske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?