Brown v. Medtronic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel E Brown and Daniel E. Brown
Defendant: Medtronic Logistics, LLC, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co., Medtronic, Inc. and Medtronic USA, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00295
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Daniel E. Brown; Medtronic USA, Inc. waiver served on 9/29/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Presby, Ellen) Modified on 10/20/2020 corrected date(kjw).
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Daniel E. Brown; Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co. waiver served on 9/29/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Presby, Ellen) Modified on 10/20/2020 corrected date (kjw).
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Daniel E. Brown; Medtronic Logistics, LLC waiver served on 9/29/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Presby, Ellen) Modified on 10/20/2020 corrected date (kjw).
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Daniel E. Brown; Medtronic, Inc. waiver served on 9/29/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Presby, Ellen)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ellen Presby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/7/2020. (slg)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4267713 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Daniel E. Brown. (Presby, Ellen)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Packet) (don)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Medtronic Logistics, LLC, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4257267., filed by Daniel E Brown. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/24/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14a, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16)(Cook, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Medtronic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel E Brown
Represented By: James H. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel E. Brown
Represented By: James H. Cook
Represented By: Ellen A. Presby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?