Contego Spa Designs, Inc. v. Stiletto LLC
Plaintiff: Contego Spa Designs, Inc.
Defendant: Stiletto LLC doing business as Stiletto Nails & Lashes and Stiletto LLC an Iowa limited liability company doing business as Stiletto Nails & Lashes
Case Number: 4:2020cv00296
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR CLOSING DOCUMENTS: As requested in the parties' Notice of Tentative Settlement #14 , the deadline for defendant to answer the complaint shall be stayed. The parties shall file closing documents for the case by December 23, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/23/2020. (jeb)
November 20, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement (Tentative) by Stiletto LLC (Koenig, Brian)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall have until November 20, 2020 to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/16/2020. (jeb)
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Stiletto LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Koenig, Brian)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall have until November 12, 2020 to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/21/2020. (jeb)
October 21, 2020 Filing 10 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Stiletto LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Koenig, Brian)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. (Franklin, Sarah)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. Stiletto LLC served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Franklin, Sarah)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 ***Filed incorrectly** Summons Issued as to Stiletto LLC. (Franklin, Sarah) Modified on 10/15/2020, emailed attorney to refile (kjw).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Neal Cohen; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice James Sakaguchi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 9/30/2020. (kjw)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4260173 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. (Franklin, Sarah)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4260153 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. (Franklin, Sarah)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT REGARDING COPYRIGHT mailed to registrar. @ Register of CopyrightsU.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000 (don)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (don)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COPYRIGHT/PATENT/TRADEMARK COMPLAINT Contego Spa Designs, Inc. against Stiletto LLC Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4258867., filed by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/28/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Franklin, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contego Spa Designs, Inc. v. Stiletto LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contego Spa Designs, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah K. Franklin
Represented By: James K. Sakaguchi
Represented By: Neal M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stiletto LLC doing business as Stiletto Nails & Lashes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stiletto LLC an Iowa limited liability company doing business as Stiletto Nails & Lashes
Represented By: Brian J. Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?