Bell v. City of Des Moines, Iowa et al
Plaintiff: Brian J Bell and Brian J. Bell
Defendant: City of Des Moines, Iowa, Garth House, Kenneth Robinson, Kenneth Robinson, II and Garth L. House
Case Number: 4:2020cv00326
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983vp
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Brian J. Bell; Kenneth Robinson, II waiver served on 10/26/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Bohlman, Brandon)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Brian J. Bell; Garth L. House waiver served on 10/26/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Bohlman, Brandon)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Des Moines, Iowa, Garth L. House, Kenneth Robinson, II.(Mackel-Wiederanders, Michelle)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons. (kjw)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4282743., filed by Brian J Bell. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/21/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/21/2021.(Bohlman, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. City of Des Moines, Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Des Moines, Iowa
Represented By: Michelle Mackel-Wiederanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garth House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Robinson, II
Represented By: Michelle Mackel-Wiederanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garth L. House
Represented By: Michelle Mackel-Wiederanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian J Bell
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Represented By: Brandon McCaull Bohlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian J. Bell
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Represented By: Brandon McCaull Bohlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?