Landacre v. Mechanical Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: travis landacre
Defendant: mechanical systems, inc and Mechanical Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00330
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Fillable Order) (bam)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for particulars. Status Conference set for 3/25/2021 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 5/24/2021 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 7/26/2021 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/10/2020. (bam)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER adopting #6 REGARDING PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 12/29/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 1/29/2021. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/29/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/19/2021. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 4/23/2021. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 5/21/2021. Discovery Deadline 8/23/2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline 9/24/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2022 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Bench Trial set for 2/21/2022 09:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Judge Stephanie M. Rose. Estimated trial length of 5 days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/10/2020. (bam) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/15/2020) (bam). (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/18/2020) (bam).
December 10, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/10/2020. Attorney Nathan James Borland appeared for Plaintiff. Attorney Danielle D. Smid appeared for Defendants. Status of the case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 11 minutes. (bam)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Borland, Nathan)
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Mechanical Systems, Inc.. (Smid, Danielle)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 12/10/2020 at 11:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. The Parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan pursuant to L.R. 16 by 12/3/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/2/2020. (bam)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Mechanical Systems, Inc..(Smid, Danielle)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 11/25/2020. (kmc)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by mechanical systems, inc from Iowa District Court for Dallas County, case number LACV042591. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4285069., filed by mechanical systems, inc. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smid, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landacre v. Mechanical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: travis landacre
Represented By: Nathan James Borland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mechanical systems, inc
Represented By: Danielle D. Smid
Represented By: Brian P Rickert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mechanical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Brian P Rickert
Represented By: Danielle D. Smid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?