Hill v. Seaboard Foods of Iowa, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Duane Hill
Defendant: Seaboard Foods Services, Inc. and Seaboard Foods of Iowa, L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00332
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441wt
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER re #10 Order. A Status conference is set for 11:00 a.m. on February 9, 2021, before the undersigned. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731 at the prompt. A Joint Agenda shall be filed by 4:00 p.m. on February 4, 2021. If there are no issues, counsel may request the Status Conference be canceled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/7/2020. (mlr)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case is set for a jury trial before the Honorable Stephanie M. Rose beginning on March 14, 2022, at the U.S. Courthouse in Des Moines, Iowa. Estimated length of trial is seven days. Final Pretrial Conference is set before the Honorable Celeste F. Bremer at 10:00 AM on March 3, 2022. The parties shall comply with the requirements for final pretrial conference set forth in the Court's Order [ECF 10]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/7/2020. (mlr)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting #9 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Seven-day Jury Trial set for 3/14/2022 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 145 - 1st Floor South before Judge Stephanie M. Rose. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2022 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Initial Disclosures Deadline 1/8/2021. Motions to Add Parties due by 1/22/2021. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/22/2021. Status Conference set for 2/9/2021 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/12/2021. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 4/16/2021. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 5/14/2021. Discovery Deadline 9/3/2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline 10/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/7/2020. (mlr)
December 2, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Borland, Nathan)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Linda Adeniji; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kimberly Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 11/24/2020. (slg)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4316369 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Seaboard Foods Services, Inc., Seaboard Foods of Iowa, L.L.C.. (Jones, Kimberly)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4316332 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Seaboard Foods Services, Inc., Seaboard Foods of Iowa, L.L.C.. (Adeniji, Linda)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT Local Rule 81(a) Statement by Seaboard Foods Services, Inc., Seaboard Foods of Iowa, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Notice of Removal)(Moothart, Bruce)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Seaboard Foods Services, Inc., Seaboard Foods of Iowa, L.L.C.. (Moothart, Bruce)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Seaboard Foods Services, Inc., Seaboard Foods of Iowa, L.L.C..(Moothart, Bruce)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 11/30/2020. (kmc)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Seaboard Foods Services, Inc., Seaboard Foods of Iowa, L.L.C. from Davis County District Court, case number LALA012698. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4285608., filed by Seaboard Foods Services, Inc., Seaboard Foods of Iowa, L.L.C.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Petition and Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Hubbard, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moothart, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Seaboard Foods of Iowa, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaboard Foods Services, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce A. Moothart
Represented By: Linda A. Adeniji
Represented By: Kimberly A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaboard Foods of Iowa, L.L.C.
Represented By: Bruce A. Moothart
Represented By: Linda A. Adeniji
Represented By: Kimberly A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Hill
Represented By: Nathan James Borland
Represented By: Katie A. Ervin Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?