Rees v. United States of America
Petitioner: Paul Thomas Rees
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2020cv00333
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Paul Thomas Rees. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 11/10/2020. (kjw)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Dismissing #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Paul Thomas Rees. The clerk shall enter judgment in favor of the respondent. No certificate of appealability shall issue. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 11/9/2020. (mem)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Leigh Glasgow on behalf of United States of America (Glasgow, Andrea)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Paul Thomas Rees. See entry #1 for image. Responses due by 11/10/2020. (slg)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Paul Thomas Rees. (slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rees v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Thomas Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Glasgow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?