Crowdis v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Eric Crowdis
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00339
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (kjw)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eric Crowdis (Stoltze, Bruce)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 11/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Anita Steward)(Caminiti, Kathleen)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kathleen McLeod Caminiti. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/9/2020. (slg)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4298003 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Caminiti, Kathleen)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Pursuant to Local Rule 81 (Pappas, Matthew)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Pappas, Matthew)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Matthew Wells Fargo from Polk County, case number 05771LACL148621. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4292836., filed by Matthew Wells Fargo. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Pappas, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crowdis v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew P. Pappas
Represented By: Kathleen McLeod Caminiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Crowdis
Represented By: Bruce H. Stoltze, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?