Grant v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: James L Grant and James L. Grant
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2021cv00060
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion to Stay. All deadlines and hearings are stayed while the Parties work on settlement. The Parties shall file a status report to update the Court on settlement progress by no later than 7/1/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/1/2021. (bam)
April 1, 2021 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Stay by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 4/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lindenfeld, Noah)
April 1, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/1/2021. (bam)
March 26, 2021 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David P. Matthews; granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark E. Chavez. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/26/2021. (kjw)
March 26, 2021 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard A. Freese. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/26/2021. (kjw)
March 26, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4438772 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by James L. Grant. (Galligan, Brian)
March 26, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4438659 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by James L. Grant. (Galligan, Brian)
March 26, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4438647 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by James L. Grant. (Galligan, Brian)
March 25, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Galligan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Galligan, Brian)
March 5, 2021 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John S. Gearan. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/5/2021. (slg)
March 5, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Gearan, John)
March 5, 2021 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Noah Lindenfeld. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/5/2021. (slg)
March 5, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lederer, Gregory)
March 5, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated Notice Regarding MDL Counsel for Defendants (Lederer, Gregory)
March 5, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lindenfeld, Noah)
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M. Lederer on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Lederer, Gregory)
February 25, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 3/17/2021. (kjw)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS/PRO SE PARTY: Your case has been opened in the SDIA and assigned a new case number. Please review the attached document and forms for compliance with this Court's Local Rules. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/2/2021. (kjw)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 4/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. The Parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided in L.R. 16 by 4/2/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/24/2021. (bam)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-04425. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 24, 2021 Judge Stephanie M. Rose and Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. (don)
February 23, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Southern District of Iowa via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *AMENDED By Doc. #6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP).
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Amended Stipulation (doc. 20978 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/4/19. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP).
November 30, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-4425-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 30, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14912597 filed by James L Grant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Gregory M. Lederer
Represented By: Noah Lindenfeld
Represented By: John S. Gearan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Gregory M. Lederer
Represented By: Noah Lindenfeld
Represented By: John S. Gearan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L Grant
Represented By: Calle M Mendenhall
Represented By: Richard Arthur Freese
Represented By: David P Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Grant
Represented By: David P. Matthews
Represented By: Mark E. Chavez
Represented By: Brian P. Galligan
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?