Lawrence v. Commissioner of Social Security
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Petitioner: Cheryl Lawrence
Case Number: 4:2021cv00118
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Stephen H Locher
2 Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stephen H. Locher added. Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons, In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons (don)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 4/26/2021. (alb)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cheryl Lawrence. (Stettler, Casey)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Cheryl Lawrence. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP)(Stettler, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cheryl Lawrence
Represented By: Casey B. Stettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?