Schuler Farms Co. v. E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
Plaintiff: Schuler Farms and Schuler Farms Co.
Defendant: E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
Intervenor Defendant: Verbio North America Corporation
Case Number: 4:2021cv00138
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Stephen H Locher
2 Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 7/20/21 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen H. Locher. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1839 and enter code 3234426 to join the call. The Parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided in L.R. 16 by 7/15/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen H. Locher on 6/28/2021. (lcw)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brion B. Doyle; granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffery D. Koelzer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen H. Locher on 6/23/2021. (kjw)
June 23, 2021 Filing 19 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), COUNTERCLAIM against Schuler Farms Co. by Verbio North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (kjw)
June 22, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Verbio North America Corporation. (Koelzer, Jeffrey)
June 22, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company, Verbio North America Corporation. (Doyle, Brion)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Intervene. Pursuant to Local Rule 7(f), the Court grants Verbio North America Corporation's Motion. Furthermore, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(a), the Court finds Intervenor Verbio North America Corporation has a legally protectable interest, that may be impaired as a result of the litigation, and that is not adequately protected by the existing parties in the litigation. The Court further finds Intervenor Verbio North America Corporation has established Article III standing. The Clerk of Court shall detach and file the Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaim [11-1 Exhibit A]. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 6/21/2021. (klw)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey D. Koelzer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen H. Locher on 6/10/2021. (kjw)
June 10, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4511721 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company. (Koelzer, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company. (Doyle, Brion)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File corporate disclosure statement to and including June 7, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 5/27/2021. (mlr)
May 27, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stephen H. Locher added. Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer no longer assigned to case. Motions referred to Stephen H. Locher. (don)
May 26, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Intervene by Verbio North America Corporation.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 6/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Brief in Support)(Lantz, Todd)
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 6/9/2021. (Lantz, Todd)
May 18, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint ,Affirmative Defenses, and Reliance on Jury Demand by E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company.(Doyle, Brion)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brion B. Doyle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 5/18/2021. (slg)
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4489122 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company. (Doyle, Brion)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company answer due 5/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 5/11/2021. (mlr)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Fautsch, David)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 5/26/2021. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 5/26/2021. (kjw)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT of Removing Party Pursuant to Local Rule 81 by E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company. (Lantz, Todd)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company Civil Cover Sheet (Lantz, Todd)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company from District Court of Story County, case number LACV052214. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4480008., filed by E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 8/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lantz, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuler Farms Co. v. E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schuler Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schuler Farms Co.
Represented By: Matthew Mark Boles
Represented By: Adam Clifford Witosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: Todd M. Lantz
Represented By: David N. Fautsch
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Koelzer
Represented By: Brion B. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Verbio North America Corporation
Represented By: David N. Fautsch
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Koelzer
Represented By: Todd M. Lantz
Represented By: Brion B. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?