Barrett v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Lori Barrett
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2021cv00140
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 7/8/2021 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783 to join the call. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/23/2021. (bam)
May 12, 2021 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Noah Lindenfeld; granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John S. Gearan. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/12/2021. (kjw)
May 11, 2021 Filing 15 ***MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice*** NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Gearan on behalf of All Defendants (Gearan, John) Modified on 5/11/2021 (kjw).
May 11, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lindenfeld, Noah)
May 11, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated Notice Regarding MDL Counsel for Defendants (Lederer, Gregory)
May 11, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lederer, Gregory)
May 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M. Lederer on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Lederer, Gregory)
May 10, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 5/28/2021. (kjw)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS/PRO SE PARTY: Your case has been opened in the SDIA and assigned a new case number. Please review the attached document and forms for compliance with this Court's Local Rules. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 8/5/2021. (kjw)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-04481. Original file
May 7, 2021 Judge Stephanie M. Rose and Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. (kjw)
May 7, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Southern District of Iowa via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 *AMENDED by Doc. #7 --FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF).
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated (see Doc. 22012-2). The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Full Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/15/21. (MAP)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - (1) The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated (see Doc. 22012-2). The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Full Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/14/21. (MAP)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21018 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/7/20. (MAP) *Modified on 4/14/2021 (MAP).
December 4, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-4481-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
December 4, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14925237 filed by Lori Barrett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Gregory M. Lederer
Represented By: John S. Gearan
Represented By: Noah Lindenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Gregory M. Lederer
Represented By: John S. Gearan
Represented By: Noah Lindenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Barrett
Represented By: Debra J Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?