Henry Schein, Inc. v. Drea et al
Plaintiff: Henry Schein, Inc.
Defendant: brett drea, jason helkenn, lori blaser, Lori Kearney and Lori Langmeier
Case Number: 4:2021cv00192
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
2 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 39 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 9/16/2021 at 11:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. The Parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided in L.R. 16 by 9/9/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/9/2021. (bam)
August 6, 2021 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint by Brett Drea.(Carroll, Michael)
August 5, 2021 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry Schein, Inc.. Lori Blaser served on 7/3/2021, answer due 7/26/2021; Brett Drea served on 7/2/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Return of Executed Summons)(Armentrout, Randall)
August 5, 2021 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint by Jason Helkenn.(Hanson, Margaret)
August 5, 2021 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint by Lori Blaser.(Hanson, Margaret)
August 3, 2021 Filing 34 CONSENT ORDER as to Brett Drea. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/3/2021. (bam)
August 3, 2021 Filing 33 CONSENT ORDER as to Lori Blaser. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/3/2021. (bam)
August 3, 2021 Filing 32 CONSENT ORDER as to Jason Helkenn. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/3/2021. (bam)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Referring for limited purpose regarding entries #25 , #26 and ] #27 Sealed Documents filed by Henry Schein, Inc., to Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 8/3/2021. (don)
August 3, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Consent(s) by Henry Schein, Inc. (Armentrout, Randall)
August 3, 2021 Filing 29 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/3/2021. Attorneys Randall D. Armentrout and Lynn C. Herndon appeared for Plaintiff. Attorney Michael J. Carroll appeared on behalf of Defendant Brett Drea. Attorneys Margaret Ann Hanson and Spencer Matthew Willems appeared for Defendants Jason Helkenn and Lori Blaser. Status of the case discussed. Total Court Time: 14 minutes. (bam)
July 30, 2021 Filing 28 TEXT ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783 to join the call. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/30/2021. (k)
July 29, 2021 Filing 27 Sealed Document re 24 Order, by Henry Schein, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armentrout, Randall)
July 29, 2021 Filing 26 Sealed Document re 24 Order, by Henry Schein, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armentrout, Randall)
July 29, 2021 Filing 25 Sealed Document re 24 Order, on Consent by Henry Schein, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armentrout, Randall)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER. The parties have notified the Court that an agreement has been reached. Accordingly, the hearing set for 7/28/2021 is cancelled. Counsel are instructed to file their resolution documents under seal by no later than 8/2/2021. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 7/28/2021. (hfh)
July 26, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY in Support of its re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Henry Schein, Inc..(Armentrout, Randall)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER Resetting Reply Deadline. Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Responses to Motion for Preliminary Injunction must be filed no later than close of business 7/26/2021. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 7/23/2021. (hfh)
July 22, 2021 Filing 21 Errata re #20 Brief/Other filed by Brett Drea, #19 Response to Motion filed by Brett Drea. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Carroll, Michael) Modified on 7/23/2021 linked to motion #2 (kjw).
July 22, 2021 Filing 20 BRIEF by Brett Drea re #19 Response to Motion for Injunction. (Carroll, Michael) Modified on 7/23/2021 linked to motion #2 (kjw).
July 22, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Brett Drea. Replies due by 7/29/2021.(Carroll, Michael)
July 21, 2021 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER Granting #16 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. All Defendants shall have until July 22, 2021 to file a resistance to the motion. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/21/2021. (bam)
July 20, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lori Blaser, Jason Helkenn. Replies due by 7/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit Blaser Declaration, #3 Affidavit Helkenn Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Hanson, Margaret)
July 20, 2021 Filing 16 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESISTANCE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR INJUNCTION by Lori Blaser, Brett Drea, Jason Helkenn.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 8/3/2021. (Carroll, Michael)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion hearing is set for 7/28/2021 at 01:00 PM in Des Moines - Room 160 - 1st Floor North before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 7/19/2021. (hfh)
July 16, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Henry Schein, Inc.. (Armentrout, Randall)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: This case was recently reassigned to Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. The Status Conference previously set for Friday July 16, 2021 at 12:00 pm is cancelled and will be reset by Judge Ebinger's chambers if needed. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 7/14/2021. (kmc)
July 14, 2021 Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger added. Judge Stephanie M. Rose no longer assigned to case. (don)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference is set for 7/16/2021 at 12:00 PM by Phone Hearing. Counsel shall call 1-888-808-6929 and enter code 2486346. Hearing will be held before Judge Stephanie M. Rose. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 7/12/2021. (mkh)
July 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Henry Schein, Inc. Response to #9 Defendants Jason Helkenn's and Lori Blaser's Motion for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Armentrout, Randall)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. All Defendants shall have until July 20, 2021 to file a resistance to the motion. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 7/12/2021. (mne)
July 9, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction for Defendants Jason Helkenn and Lori Blaser by Lori Blaser, Jason Helkenn.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 7/23/2021. (Hanson, Margaret)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Henry Schein, Inc.; Jason Helkenn waiver served on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Armentrout, Randall)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Matthew Willems on behalf of Lori Blaser, Jason Helkenn (Willems, Spencer)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley J. Thompson on behalf of Lori Blaser, Jason Helkenn (Thompson, Stanley)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Hanson on behalf of Lori Blaser, Jason Helkenn (Hanson, Margaret)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Carroll on behalf of Brett Drea (Carroll, Michael)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 7/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (kjw)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Henry Schein, Inc.. Responses due by 7/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Declaration of Kenyon Murray, #3 Declaration of Blake Harms, #4 Declaration of Gavin Schramm, #5 Declaration of Gene Zinovchuk, #6 Exhibit 1-15)(Armentrout, Randall) (Attachment 5 replaced on 6/30/2021) straightened pages (kjw).
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4528185., filed by Henry Schein, Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/27/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Armentrout, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry Schein, Inc. v. Drea et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: brett drea
Represented By: Michael J. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jason helkenn
Represented By: Margaret Ann Hanson
Represented By: Spencer Matthew Willems
Represented By: Stanley J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lori blaser
Represented By: Margaret Ann Hanson
Represented By: Spencer Matthew Willems
Represented By: Stanley J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Kearney
Represented By: Margaret Ann Hanson
Represented By: Spencer Matthew Willems
Represented By: Stanley J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Langmeier
Represented By: Margaret Ann Hanson
Represented By: Spencer Matthew Willems
Represented By: Stanley J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Schein, Inc.
Represented By: Randall D. Armentrout
Represented By: Lynn C. Herndon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?