Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. Reynolds et al
Plaintiff: Animal Legal Defense Fund, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc., Bailing Out Benji, Food & Water Watch and Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement
Defendant: Kim Reynolds, Tom Miller, Vanessa Strazdas, Chuck Sinnard and John Gish
Case Number: 4:2021cv00231
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
2 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to file overlength brief. Defendant may file their overlength brief. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 10/8/2021. (jsa)
October 8, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to file overlength brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by John Gish, Tom Miller, Kim Reynolds, Chuck Sinnard, Vanessa Strazdas.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Larson, Jacob)
October 8, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by John Gish, Tom Miller, Kim Reynolds, Chuck Sinnard, Vanessa Strazdas. Responses due by 10/22/2021. (Larson, Jacob)
August 17, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Bailing Out Benji, Animal Legal Defense Fund, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc., Food & Water Watch, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement; All Defendants. (Muraskin, David)
August 17, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji, Food & Water Watch, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Muraskin, David)
August 13, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew Strugar. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/13/2021. (kjw)
August 13, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji, Food & Water Watch, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Strugar, Matthew)
August 13, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christine Ball-Blakely. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/13/2021. (kjw)
August 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4570857 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji. (Ball-Blakely, Christine)
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Cristina R. Stella. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/13/2021. (kjw)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji. (Stella, Cristina)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tyler Lobdell. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/12/2021. (kjw)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4570072 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Food & Water Watch. (Lobdell, Tyler)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David S. Muraskin; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kelsey R. Eberly. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/12/2021. (kjw)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Animal Legal Defense Fund. (Eberly, Kelsey)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4569419 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji, Food & Water Watch, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Muraskin, David)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 8/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (kjw)
August 11, 2021 Judge Stephanie M. Rose added. Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt no longer assigned to case. (don)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4567131., filed by Bailing Out Benji, Animal Legal Defense Fund, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc., Food & Water Watch, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/8/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/8/2021.(Kelly, Devin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. Reynolds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Animal Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: Devin Ceres Kelly
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Christine Ball-Blakely
Represented By: Cristina Rachel Stella
Represented By: David Samuel Muraskin
Represented By: Kelsey Rinehart Eberly
Represented By: Matthew Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.
Represented By: Devin Ceres Kelly
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: David Samuel Muraskin
Represented By: Matthew Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bailing Out Benji
Represented By: Devin Ceres Kelly
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Christine Ball-Blakely
Represented By: Cristina Rachel Stella
Represented By: David Samuel Muraskin
Represented By: Matthew Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Food & Water Watch
Represented By: Devin Ceres Kelly
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: David Samuel Muraskin
Represented By: Matthew Strugar
Represented By: Tyler Abbott Lobdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement
Represented By: Devin Ceres Kelly
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: David Samuel Muraskin
Represented By: Matthew Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Reynolds
Represented By: Jacob John Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Miller
Represented By: Jacob John Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Strazdas
Represented By: Jacob John Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Sinnard
Represented By: Jacob John Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gish
Represented By: Jacob John Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?