Huntsman v. Exile Brewing Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Fred Huntsman
Defendant: Exile Brewing Company, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00121
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: James E Gritzner
2 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/1/2022. (jeb)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Initial Disclosures due by 7/1/2022. Motions to Add Parties due by 9/26/2022. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/26/2022. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/26/2022. Defendant Expert Witness Disclosures due by 1/13/2023. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/14/2023. Discovery Deadline 3/27/2023. Dispositive Motion & Daubert Motion Deadline 4/27/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2023 9:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse Room 160 before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Jury Trial set to begin 1/16/2024 9:00 AM for estimated 9 days in Des Moines Courthouse Room 160 before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/1/2022. (jeb)
June 1, 2022 Filing 36 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/1/2022. Attorney Scott Wadding appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Kristina Kamler appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Court Time: 10 minutes. (jeb)
May 26, 2022 Filing 35 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Kamler, Kristina)
May 24, 2022 Filing 34 REDACTION to #29 Order on Motion to Seal,,, by Exile Brewing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doc. No. 5)(Kamler, Kristina)
May 24, 2022 Filing 33 REDACTION to #29 Order on Motion to Seal,,, by Exile Brewing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doc. No. 4)(Kamler, Kristina)
May 24, 2022 Filing 32 REDACTION to #29 Order on Motion to Seal,,, by Exile Brewing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doc No. 2, #2 Exhibit Doc No. 3)(Kamler, Kristina)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference will be held June 1, 2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by May 26, 2022. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/18/2022. (jeb)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #8 Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the 12/4/20 Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/18/2022. (jeb)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #21 Defendant's Supplemental Motion to Seal or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike From the Record and File Under Seal; granting #24 Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Seal Additional Confidential Information. Motions granted provisionally subject to review and further order of the Court. Redacted versions of Docket Nos. 2, 3, 4 and 5 must be filed by May 25, 2022. See order for other details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/17/2022. (jeb)
May 17, 2022 Filing 28 ***RESPONSE*** REPLY and Response to Doc. No. 24 re #24 MOTION to Seal filed by Exile Brewing Company, LLC.(Kamler, Kristina) Modified on 5/17/2022 ***Reply deadline set for 5/24/2022*** (kjw).
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part #25 Plaintiffs' Motion for Settlement Conference. Deadline of July 29, 2022 set for parties to complete private mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/16/2022. (jeb)
May 13, 2022 Filing 26 ***REPLY To Motion #21 ***REPLY and Response to Doc. Nos. 23 and 24 re #24 MOTION to Seal filed by Exile Brewing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kamler, Kristina) Modified on 5/16/2022 **Attorney to refile response to #24 so reply deadline can be set. (btg).
May 10, 2022 Filing 25 Unresisted MOTION for Settlement/Settlement Conference by Fred Huntsman.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 5/24/2022. (Wadding, Scott)
May 9, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Seal by Fred Huntsman.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 5/23/2022. (Wadding, Scott)
May 9, 2022 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 Supplemental MOTION to Seal or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike from the Record and File Under Seal filed by Fred Huntsman. Replies due by 5/16/2022.(Wadding, Scott)
April 26, 2022 Filing 22 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Conference held on 4/26/2022. Attorney Matthew Sease appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Kristina Kamler appeared for defendant. Court Time: 30 minutes. (jeb)
April 26, 2022 Filing 21 Supplemental MOTION to Seal or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike from the Record and File Under Seal by Exile Brewing Company, LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 5/10/2022. (Kamler, Kristina)
April 26, 2022 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Exile Brewing Company, LLC. (Kamler, Kristina)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting in part, temporarily, #18 Defendant's Motion to Seal. The Clerk of Court is directed to seal Docket Nos. 2, 3, 4 and 5 until further order of the Court. Defendant must supplement its motion by specifically identifying each document and page number which contains information Defendant asserts should be sealed from public access and further explain the necessity for doing so pursuant to Local Rule 5(c). Defendant's counsel also must supplement the motion in compliance with Local Rule 7(k) by conferring with counsel for plaintiffs as to whether plaintiffs consent to the motion. Defendant must file the supplement by 1:00 p.m. on April 26, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 4/25/2022. (jeb)
April 22, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Seal or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike From the Record and File Under Seal (Expedited Relief Requested) by Exile Brewing Company, LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 5/6/2022. (Kamler, Kristina)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE: At the request of the parties, a Telephonic Conference will be held April 26, 2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 4/19/2022. (jeb)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion for Status Conference. A Telephonic Conference will be set under separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 4/19/2022. (jeb)
April 18, 2022 Filing 15 REPLY re #8 MOTION filed by Fred Huntsman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wadding, Scott)
April 16, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Fred Huntsman. (Wadding, Scott)
April 16, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Michael Wadding on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wadding, Scott)
April 15, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (2nd Amended) by Exile Brewing Company, LLC.(Kamler, Kristina)
April 15, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE by Exile Brewing Company, LLC Amended Notice of Removal Adding Assertions of Supplemental Jurisdiction Over State Law Claims (Kamler, Kristina)
April 14, 2022 Filing 10 Joint MOTION Status Conference with Expedited Relief Requested by Exile Brewing Company, LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 4/28/2022. (Kamler, Kristina)
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION filed by Exile Brewing Company, LLC. Replies due by 4/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (btg)
April 11, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION To Modify The Protective Order by Fred Huntsman.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 4/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (btg)
April 11, 2022 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) No Numbers Given. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint) (btg)
April 11, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 4/29/2022. (btg)
April 11, 2022 Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger added. Senior Judge James E. Gritzner no longer assigned to case. (btg)
April 8, 2022 Filing 5 BRIEF Ex 6 - part 4 of 4 by Exile Brewing Company, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Kamler, Kristina)
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 BRIEF Ex 6 - part 3 of 4 by Exile Brewing Company, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Kamler, Kristina)
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 BRIEF Ex 6 - part 2 of 4 by Exile Brewing Company, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Kamler, Kristina)
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 BRIEF Ex 6 - part 1 of 4 by Exile Brewing Company, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Kamler, Kristina)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Exile Brewing Company, LLC from Iowa District Court of Polk County, case number CVCV060249. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number AIASDC-4787515., filed by Exile Brewing Company, LLC. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 7)(Kamler, Kristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huntsman v. Exile Brewing Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Huntsman
Represented By: Matthew Sease
Represented By: Scott Michael Wadding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exile Brewing Company, LLC
Represented By: Kristina Janice Kamler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?