Ramirez v. Wright Tree Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo Ramirez
Defendant: Wright Tree Service, Inc., ITC Holdings Corp., ITC Midwest, LLC and Jim Bauer
Case Number: 4:2022cv00312
Filed: September 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
2 Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2023 ***Civil Case Terminated. (bp)
June 7, 2023 Filing 47 Notice of Stipulated Dismissal by Ricardo Ramirez. (Stoltze, Bruce)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER CANCELING ALL DEADLINES AND HEARINGS AND FOR CLOSING DOCUMENTS. Dismissal Papers due by 6/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 4/28/2023. (amp)
April 28, 2023 Filing 45 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R): Settlement Conference held on 4/28/2023. Attorneys B. Stoltze, Jr. and Gilpatrick appeared for Plaintiff. Attorney Cano appeared for Defendant Wright Tree Service. Attorney DeVeney appeared for Defendant Bauer. Attorney Hill appeared for Defendant ITC Midwest. Total Court Time: 7 hours. (amp)
April 18, 2023 Filing 44 PROTECTIVE ORDER. See Order for particulars. For docket control purposes, ECF No. 39 is terminated. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/18/2023. (amp)
April 18, 2023 Filing 43 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Revised by ITC Midwest, LLC. Responses due by 5/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Protective Order)(Field, Lewis)
April 14, 2023 Filing 42 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R): Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/14/2023. Attorneys B. Stoltze, Jr. and Gilpatrick appeared for Plaintiff. Attorney Cano appeared for Defendant Wright Tree Service. Attorney DeVeney appeared for Defendant Bauer. Attorneys Hill and Field appeared for Defendant ITC Midwest. Status of the case discussed. Total Court Time: 11 minutes. (amp)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND FOR CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENTS. See Order for particulars. Settlement Conference set for 4/28/2023 at 09:30 AM at the Des Moines Courthouse, Room 420, before Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 4/14/2023. (amp)
April 12, 2023 Filing 40 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Jim Bauer. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
April 12, 2023 Filing 39 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by ITC Midwest, LLC. Responses due by 4/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Protective Order)(Field, Lewis)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 4/28/2023 09:30 AM in Des Moines Courthouse Rm 420 before Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R). Details to be set by further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 4/11/2023. (amp)
April 11, 2023 Filing 37 TEXT ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/14/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R). Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 5689867. Settlement conference details and logistics will be discussed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/11/2023. (amp)
April 5, 2023 Filing 36 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/5/2023. Attorneys Stoltze, Jr. and Gilpatrick appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorney Zebrowski appeared on behalf of Defendant Wright Tree Service. Attorney DeVeney appeared on behalf of Defendant Bauer. Attorney Field appeared on behalf of Defendant ITC Midwest. Status of the case discussed. Total Court Time: 13 minutes. (amp)
April 3, 2023 Filing 35 STATUS REPORT Defendants' Proposed Matters for Status Conference by ITC Midwest, LLC. (Field, Lewis)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. Telephonic Status Conferences set for 11:30 AM on 4/5/2023, 6/29/2023, 8/25/2023, and 10/27/2023 before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Parties shall file a status report in accordance with this Order at least 2 business days prior to each status conference. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/21/2023. (amp)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Fillable FPTO, #2 Supplement JERS) (amp)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER adopting #28 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 3/24/2023. Motions to Add Parties due by 5/12/2023. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/12/2023. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 6/9/2023. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/11/2023. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 9/15/2023. Discovery Deadline 10/20/2023. Dispositive Motion Deadline 11/10/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2024 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 4/29/2024 09:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Estimated length: 5 days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/21/2023. (amp)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Referring Case. See order for particulars. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 3/20/2023. (kjw)
March 20, 2023 Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams, as referral judge and Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt no longer assigned to case. (bp)
March 16, 2023 Filing 30 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/16/2023. Attorney Gilpatrick appeared for Plaintiff. Attorney Cano appeared for Defendant Wright Tree Services. Attorney DeVeney appeared for Defendant Bauer. Attorneys Hill and Field appeared for Defendant ITC Midwest, LLC. Status of the case discussed. Orders to follow. Total Court Time: 18 minutes. (amp)
March 16, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Breanne Alyssa Gilpatrick on behalf of Ricardo Ramirez (Gilpatrick, Breanne)
March 8, 2023 Filing 28 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Hill, Timothy)
February 10, 2023 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Timothy J. Hill Regarding Compensation of Attorney by ITC Midwest, LLC. (Hill, Timothy)
February 10, 2023 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint by ITC Midwest, LLC.(Hill, Timothy)
February 9, 2023 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricardo Ramirez. Jim Bauer served on 12/12/2022, answer due 2/3/2023. (Stoltze, Bruce)
February 9, 2023 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricardo Ramirez. Wright Tree Service, Inc. served on 12/9/2022, answer due 1/13/2023. (Stoltze, Bruce)
February 9, 2023 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricardo Ramirez. ITC Midwest, LLC served on 12/9/2022, answer due 2/10/2023. (Stoltze, Bruce)
February 2, 2023 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint by Jim Bauer.(DeVeney, Jeannie)
February 2, 2023 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Clerk to terminate the appearance of Attorney Townsend. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/2/2023. (amp)
February 2, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Christine Bestor Townsend by Jim Bauer.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 2/16/2023. (Townsend, Christine)
January 27, 2023 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2023 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. The parties shall file a scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under LR 16 by 3/9/2023. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/27/2023. (amp)
January 27, 2023 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting for good cause shown #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File. By 2/10/2023, Defendant ITC Midwest LLC shall answer or respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. The Court does not anticipate granting further extensions of this deadline. The parties shall file a scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under LR 16 by 3/9/2023. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/27/2023. (amp)
January 26, 2023 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Extend Certain Deadlines, and Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal of ITC Holdings Corp. by ITC Midwest, LLC.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 2/9/2023. (Hill, Timothy)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GIVING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL. Clerks Dismissal for failure to perform service on ITC Holdings Corp set for 2/3/2023. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 1/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 LR 41) (bp)
January 18, 2023 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Wright Tree Service, Inc.. (Cano, Catherine)
January 17, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Jim Bauer (DeVeney, Jeannie)
January 13, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Wright Tree Service, Inc..(Cano, Catherine)
January 5, 2023 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting for good cause shown #11 Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 2/3/2023, Defendant Bauer shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/5/2023. (amp)
January 5, 2023 Filing 11 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Jim Bauer.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Townsend, Christine)
January 5, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine E. Bestor Townsend on behalf of Jim Bauer (Townsend, Christine)
December 28, 2022 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting for good cause shown #8 Motion to Extend Deadline to File. On or before 1/13/2023, Defendant Wright Tree Service, Inc. shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/28/2022. (amp)
December 28, 2022 Filing 8 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wright Tree Service, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Cano, Catherine)
December 27, 2022 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting for good cause shown #5 Motion to Extend Time to File. On or before 1/31/2023, Defendant ITC Midwest LLC shall file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/27/2022. (amp)
December 27, 2022 Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (rm)
December 22, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by ITC Midwest, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hill, Timothy)
December 22, 2022 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ITC Midwest, LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Hill, Timothy)
December 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lewis I. Field on behalf of ITC Midwest, LLC (Field, Lewis)
December 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Hill on behalf of ITC Midwest, LLC (Hill, Timothy)
September 16, 2022 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (sml)
September 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number AIASDC-4928222., filed by Ricardo Ramirez. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/15/2022. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stoltze, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Wright Tree Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Ramirez
Represented By: Bruce H. Stoltze, Jr.
Represented By: Breanne Alyssa Gilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Tree Service, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine A. Cano
Represented By: Ann Louise Zebrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITC Holdings Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITC Midwest, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Hill
Represented By: Lewis I. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Bauer
Represented By: Jeannie M. DeVeney
Represented By: Christine E. Bestor Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?