Couser et al v. Story County, Iowa et al
Plaintiff: William Couser and Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Story County, Iowa, Story County Board of Supervisors, Latifah Faisal, Linda Murken and Lisa Heddens
Case Number: 4:2022cv00383
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: James E Gritzner
Referring Judge: Stephen B Jackson
2 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 60101 Pipeline Safety Act of 1994
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Final Pretrial Order Form) (jeb)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Initial Disclosures due by 1/30/2023. Motions to Add Parties due by 2/28/2023. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/28/2023. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 1/30/2023. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/30/2023. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 4/28/2023. Discovery Deadline 5/30/2023. Dispositive Motion Deadline 6/30/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2023 10:00 a.m. in Des Moines Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Bench Trial set to begin 12/11/2023 9:00 a.m. for estimated 2 days in Des Moines Courthouse Room 145 before Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 1/4/2023. (jeb)
January 4, 2023 Filing 18 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/4/2023. Attorney Bret Dublinske appeared for plaintiffs. Attorney Jason Craig appeared for defendants. Scheduling order to be entered. Court Time: 5 minutes. (jeb)
December 30, 2022 Filing 17 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Dublinske, Bret)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference will be held January 4, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by December 28, 2022. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/19/2022. (jeb)
December 15, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Latifah Faisal, Lisa Heddens, Linda Murken, Story County Board of Supervisors, Story County, Iowa.(Craig, Jason)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Defendants' Unresisted Motion for Extension of Answer Deadline. Defendants have until December 15, 2022 to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/8/2022. (jeb)
December 8, 2022 Filing 13 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Latifah Faisal, Lisa Heddens, Linda Murken, Story County Board of Supervisors, Story County, Iowa.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Craig, Jason)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian David Boone; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Karla M. Doe; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Roger Hoernlein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 11/30/2022. (btg)
November 28, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Story County, Iowa served on 11/17/2022, answer due 12/8/2022. (Dublinske, Bret)
November 28, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Story County Board of Supervisors served on 11/17/2022, answer due 12/8/2022. (Dublinske, Bret)
November 28, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Lisa Heddens served on 11/17/2022, answer due 12/8/2022. (Dublinske, Bret)
November 28, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Linda Murken served on 11/17/2022, answer due 12/8/2022. (Dublinske, Bret)
November 28, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Latifah Faisal served on 11/17/2022, answer due 12/8/2022. (Dublinske, Bret)
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-4989643 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. (Dublinske, Bret)
November 28, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-4989635 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. (Dublinske, Bret)
November 28, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-4989619 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. (Dublinske, Bret)
November 22, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. (Dublinske, Bret)
November 15, 2022 Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose added. Senior Judge James E. Gritzner no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 12/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 LR 7.1 Packet) (bp)
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number AIASDC-4980068., filed by William Couser, Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/12/2023. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dublinske, Bret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Couser et al v. Story County, Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Couser
Represented By: Bret Alan Dublinske
Represented By: Brant Michael Leonard
Represented By: Kristy Dahl Rogers
Represented By: Brian David Boone
Represented By: Karla M. Doe
Represented By: Michael Roger Hoernlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Carbon Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Bret Alan Dublinske
Represented By: Brant Michael Leonard
Represented By: Kristy Dahl Rogers
Represented By: Brian David Boone
Represented By: Karla M. Doe
Represented By: Michael Roger Hoernlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Story County, Iowa
Represented By: Jason Michael Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Story County Board of Supervisors
Represented By: Jason Michael Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latifah Faisal
Represented By: Jason Michael Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Murken
Represented By: Jason Michael Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Heddens
Represented By: Jason Michael Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?