United States of America v. Huyser et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: James Huyser, Matthew Kinley, Kenneth Boyle, Jeffrey W Carter, JWC Investments LC, Jeffrey W. Carter and JWC Investments L.C.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00144
Filed: May 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen H Locher
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #22 United States' Consent Motion to Enlarge Tile to File Reply to Defendant Huyser's Resistance to United States' Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses. Plaintiff has until July 11, 2023 to file its reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/28/2023. (jeb)
June 27, 2023 Filing 22 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendant Huyser's Resistance to United States' Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses by United States of America.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 7/11/2023. (Nygaard, Gretchen)
June 27, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Strike #8 Answer to Complaint (Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Huyser and Certificate of Service) filed by Kenneth Boyle. Replies due by 7/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Lantz, Todd)
June 26, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Strike #8 Answer to Complaint (Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Huyser and Certificate of Service) filed by James Huyser. Replies due by 7/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Morse, David)
June 16, 2023 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Kenneth Boyle.(Lantz, Todd)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER Granting #16 Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and Denying #12 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Defendants Jeffrey Carter and JWC Investments, L.C., must file a responsive pleading on or before July 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Stephen H. Locher on June 14, 2023. (mm)
June 13, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike #8 Answer to Complaint (Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Huyser and Certificate of Service) by United States of America.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 6/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Nygaard, Gretchen)
June 12, 2023 Filing 16 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Jeffrey W. Carter, JWC Investments L.C..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (McCormally, Shayla)
June 6, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Shayla Laura McCormally on behalf of Jeffrey W. Carter, JWC Investments L.C. (McCormally, Shayla)
May 30, 2023 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service (Amended) re #13 Declaration, #12 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default re Jeffrey W. Carter, JWC Investments L.C. by United States of America. (Nygaard, Gretchen)
May 30, 2023 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Gretchen Ellen Nygaard re #12 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default re Jeffrey W. Carter, JWC Investments L.C. by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Servicemembers Certification for Jeffrey Carter)(Nygaard, Gretchen)
May 30, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default re Jeffrey W. Carter, JWC Investments L.C. by United States of America. Responses due by 6/13/2023. (Nygaard, Gretchen)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Defendant Kenneth Boyle's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant Kenneth Boyle has until June 16, 2023 to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/25/2023. (jeb)
May 25, 2023 Filing 10 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Kenneth Boyle.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Lantz, Todd)
May 25, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd M. Lantz on behalf of Kenneth Boyle (Lantz, Todd)
May 23, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by James Huyser.(Morse, David)
May 15, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. James Huyser served on 5/7/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Nygaard, Gretchen)
May 15, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. JWC Investments L.C. served on 5/5/2023, answer due 5/26/2023. (Nygaard, Gretchen)
May 15, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Jeffrey W. Carter served on 5/5/2023, answer due 5/26/2023. (Nygaard, Gretchen)
May 15, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Kenneth Boyle served on 5/5/2023, answer due 5/26/2023. (Nygaard, Gretchen)
May 9, 2023 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States of America; Matthew Kinley waiver served on 5/5/2023, answer due 7/5/2023. (Nygaard, Gretchen)
May 2, 2023 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 5/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (btg)
May 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/27/2023.(Nygaard, Gretchen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Huyser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gretchen E. Nygaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Huyser
Represented By: David Alan Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Kinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Boyle
Represented By: Todd M. Lantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey W Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JWC Investments LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey W. Carter
Represented By: Shayla Laura McCormally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JWC Investments L.C.
Represented By: Shayla Laura McCormally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?