GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force et al v. Reynolds et al
Plaintiff: GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force doing business as Iowa Safe Schools, Belinda Scarrott, Richard Carlson, Ulrike Carlson, Eric Saylor, Brigit Stevens, Joseph Stevens, Jane Smith, John Smith, Lara Newsom and John Doe
Defendant: Kim Reynolds, McKenzie Snow, Iowa Department of Education, Iowa State Board of Education, Iowa City Community School District, Matt Degner, Molly Abraham, J P Claussen, Charlie Eastham, Jayne Finch, Ruthina Malone, Mitch Lingo, Lisa Williams, Sioux City Community School District, Rod Earleywine, Dan Greenwell, Lance Ehmcke, Jan George, Treyla Lee, John Meyers, Bob Michaelson, Earl Miller, Urbandale Community School District, Rosalie Daca, Katherine Howsare, Rachel Kent, Jenny Meade, Jason Menke, Julie Mitchell, Steve Richman, Josh Van Rswyk, Carissa Williams, Margaret Young, Waterloo Community School District, Jared Smith, Sue Flynn, Jesse Knight, Astor Williams, Lyle Schmitt, Stacie Mills, Janelle Ewing, Pam Arndorfer, Jeff Sommerfeldt, West Des Moines Community School District, Matt Adams, Jeff Hicks, Michael Andreski, Elizabeth Larson, Lila P Montoya Starr, Fannette Elliott, Jill Caton Johnson, Anadelia Morgan, J. P. Claussen and Lila P. Montoya Starr
Case Number: 4:2023cv00474
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen H Locher
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 vp Violation of Due Process and Equal Protection
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 71 USCA Scheduling Order as to #66 Notice of Appeal, filed by Iowa State Board of Education, McKenzie Snow, Kim Reynolds, Iowa Department of Education. (vr)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 70 TEXT ORDER granting in part and reserving ruling in part on #69 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Appeal. The case is temporarily stayed in all respects (including, but not limited to, a stay of response deadlines to the School District Defendants' Motion to Dismiss), subject to Plaintiffs' continuing right to seek relief concerning compliance with the preliminary injunction. On or before January 29, 2024, Plaintiffs and the School District Defendants shall file a response to #69 Motion to Stay explaining why they believe they would be harmed if the stay remains in effect pending resolution of the appeal. Signed by Judge Stephen H. Locher on 1/17/2024. (mm)
January 17, 2024 Filing 69 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Appeal by Iowa Department of Education, Iowa State Board of Education, Kim Reynolds, McKenzie Snow.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 1/31/2024. (Johnston, Daniel)
January 17, 2024 Filing 68 USCA Case Number 24-1075 for #66 Notice of Appeal, filed by Iowa State Board of Education, McKenzie Snow, Kim Reynolds, Iowa Department of Education. (vr)
January 16, 2024 Filing 67 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA Supplement by District Court Clerk to USCA re #66 Notice of Appeal, filed on 1/12/2024. (vr)
January 12, 2024 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #65 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Iowa Department of Education, Iowa State Board of Education, Kim Reynolds, McKenzie Snow. Fee paid in the amount of $605 receipt number AIASDC-5344322. (Johnston, Daniel)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Order for particulars. Signed by Judge Stephen H. Locher on 12/29/2023. (mm)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 TEXT ORDER granting #63 Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Resist School District Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs have until January 17, 2024 to respond to School District Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #51 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/28/2023. (jeb)
December 28, 2023 Filing 63 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #51 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM School District Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Richard Carlson, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Lara Newsom, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Jane Smith, John Smith, Brigit Stevens, Joseph Stevens.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Story, Thomas)
December 28, 2023 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re #60 Motion Hearing held on 12/22/2023 before Judge Stephen H. Locher. Court Reporter: Tonya R. Gerke, Telephone Number: (515) 284-6444. Page Nos.: 1-104. Transcript may be viewed at court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter before deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through court reporter, Clerk's Office, or PACER. Redaction Request due 1/22/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/1/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/1/2024. (trg)
December 26, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Richard Carlson, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Brigit Stevens, John Smith, Lara Newsom, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, Jane Smith, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Joseph Stevens dismissing party Julie Mitchell, Steve Richman. (Story, Thomas)
December 22, 2023 Filing 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephen H. Locher: Motion Hearing held on 12/22/2023 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, John Doe, Lara Newsom, Belinda Scarrott, Ulrike Carlson, Jane Smith, John Smith, Eric Saylor, Brigit Stevens, Joseph Stevens, Richard Carlson. (Court Reporter Tonya Gerke.) (Time in Court: 2 hrs. 45 min.) (kjs)
December 22, 2023 Filing 59 REPLY BRIEF by Richard Carlson, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Lara Newsom, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Jane Smith, John Smith, Brigit Stevens, Joseph Stevens re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (nla)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TEXT ORDER granting #57 Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension to Answer or File a Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Kim Reynolds, McKenzie Snow, Iowa Department of Education and Iowa State Board of Education have until 39 days after the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/21/2023. (jeb)
December 21, 2023 Filing 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS by Iowa Department of Education, Iowa State Board of Education, Kim Reynolds, McKenzie Snow.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Johnston, Daniel)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 TEXT ORDER granting #55 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. Pursuant to Local Rule 7(h), the Clerk of Court is directed to detach and docket the brief attached to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/21/2023. (jeb)
December 21, 2023 Filing 55 Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief by Richard Carlson, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Lara Newsom, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Jane Smith, John Smith, Brigit Stevens, Joseph Stevens.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 1/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Brief)(Edelstein, Laura)
December 20, 2023 Filing 53 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Iowa Department of Education, Iowa State Board of Education, Kim Reynolds, McKenzie Snow. Replies due by 12/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Johnston, Daniel)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEXT ORDER granting #50 Defendants' unopposed Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. Because the brief was not electronically attached to the motion as a separate document, defendants must file the brief and supporting materials on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/20/2023. (jeb)
December 20, 2023 Filing 51 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM School District Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Molly Abraham, Matt Adams, Michael Andreski, Pam Arndorfer, Jill Caton Johnson, J. P. Claussen, Rosalie Daca, Matt Degner, Rod Earleywine, Charlie Eastham, Lance Ehmcke, Fannette Elliott, Janelle Ewing, Jayne Finch, Sue Flynn, Jan George, Dan Greenwell, Jeff Hicks, Katherine Howsare, Iowa City Community School District, Rachel Kent, Jesse Knight, Elizabeth Larson, Treyla Lee, Mitch Lingo, Ruthina Malone, Jenny Meade, Jason Menke, John Meyers, Bob Michaelson, Earl Miller, Stacie Mills, Julie Mitchell, Lila P. Montoya Starr, Anadelia Morgan, Steve Richman, Lyle Schmitt, Sioux City Community School District, Jared Smith, Jeff Sommerfeldt, Urbandale Community School District, Josh Van Rswyk, Waterloo Community School District, West Des Moines Community School District, Astor Williams, Carissa Williams, Lisa Williams, Margaret Young. Responses due by 1/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support School District Defendants' Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Vaught, Lindsay)
December 19, 2023 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File TO FILE OVERLENGTH BRIEF by Iowa Department of Education, Iowa State Board of Education, Kim Reynolds, McKenzie Snow.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 1/2/2024. (Johnston, Daniel)
December 19, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Logan Spencer Brundage on behalf of Molly Abraham, Matt Adams, Michael Andreski, Pam Arndorfer, Jill Caton Johnson, J. P. Claussen, Rosalie Daca, Matt Degner, Rod Earleywine, Charlie Eastham, Lance Ehmcke, Fannette Elliott, Janelle Ewing, Jayne Finch, Sue Flynn, Jan George, Dan Greenwell, Jeff Hicks, Katherine Howsare, Iowa City Community School District, Rachel Kent, Jesse Knight, Elizabeth Larson, Treyla Lee, Mitch Lingo, Ruthina Malone, Jenny Meade, Jason Menke, John Meyers, Bob Michaelson, Earl Miller, Stacie Mills, Lila P. Montoya Starr, Anadelia Morgan, Lyle Schmitt, Sioux City Community School District, Jared Smith, Jeff Sommerfeldt, Urbandale Community School District, Josh Van Rswyk, Waterloo Community School District, West Des Moines Community School District, Astor Williams, Carissa Williams, Lisa Williams, Margaret Young (Brundage, Logan)
December 19, 2023 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Molly Abraham, Matt Adams, Michael Andreski, Pam Arndorfer, Jill Caton Johnson, J. P. Claussen, Rosalie Daca, Matt Degner, Rod Earleywine, Charlie Eastham, Lance Ehmcke, Fannette Elliott, Janelle Ewing, Jayne Finch, Sue Flynn, Jan George, Dan Greenwell, Jeff Hicks, Katherine Howsare, Iowa City Community School District, Rachel Kent, Jesse Knight, Elizabeth Larson, Treyla Lee, Mitch Lingo, Ruthina Malone, Jenny Meade, Jason Menke, John Meyers, Bob Michaelson, Earl Miller, Stacie Mills, Julie Mitchell, Lila P. Montoya Starr, Anadelia Morgan, Steve Richman, Lyle Schmitt, Sioux City Community School District, Jared Smith, Jeff Sommerfeldt, Urbandale Community School District, Josh Van Rswyk, Waterloo Community School District, West Des Moines Community School District, Astor Williams, Carissa Williams, Lisa Williams, Margaret Young. Replies due by 12/26/2023.(Vaught, Lindsay)
December 14, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Miriam D. Van Heukelem on behalf of Molly Abraham, Matt Adams, Michael Andreski, Pam Arndorfer, Jill Caton Johnson, J. P. Claussen, Rosalie Daca, Matt Degner, Rod Earleywine, Charlie Eastham, Lance Ehmcke, Fannette Elliott, Janelle Ewing, Jayne Finch, Sue Flynn, Jan George, Dan Greenwell, Jeff Hicks, Katherine Howsare, Iowa City Community School District, Rachel Kent, Jesse Knight, Elizabeth Larson, Treyla Lee, Mitch Lingo, Ruthina Malone, Jenny Meade, Jason Menke, John Meyers, Bob Michaelson, Earl Miller, Stacie Mills, Julie Mitchell, Lila P. Montoya Starr, Anadelia Morgan, Steve Richman, Lyle Schmitt, Sioux City Community School District, Jared Smith, Jeff Sommerfeldt, Urbandale Community School District, Josh Van Rswyk, Waterloo Community School District, West Des Moines Community School District, Astor Williams, Carissa Williams, Lisa Williams, Margaret Young (Van Heukelem, Miriam)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ORDER regarding hearing on motions for preliminary injunction. All parties in Case No. 4:23-cv-00474 and Case No. 4:23-cv-00478 have now responded and confirmed that they do not intend to offer live testimony at the hearing on the motions for preliminary injunction. The Court is therefore satisfied that the single consolidated hearing on December 22, 2023, at 9:00 a.m., will be sufficient to address the motions in both cases. Accordingly, the Court DENIES the Penguin House Plaintiffs' request for a separate hearing. The Court anticipates the following order of events at the December 22 hearing: (1) the GLBT Youth Plaintiffs will present argument on their motion; (2) the Penguin House Plaintiffs will present argument on their motion; (3) the State of Iowa Defendants will present argument in response to both the GLBT Youth and Penguin House motions; (4) any other Defendants wishing to be heard will present argument; (5) the GLBT Youth Plaintiffs will present rebuttal argument, if any; and (6) the Penguin House Plaintiffs will present rebuttal argument, if any. There are no other hearings scheduled before the undersigned on December 22, and thus all parties will be given as much time as they reasonably believe they need to argue their positions. The Court is likely to have substantial questions for all sides regarding, among other things, the constitutional rights at issue, the scope and governing standards for those rights, and the proper interpretation of the relevant provisions of the challenged legislation. Signed by Judge Stephen H. Locher on 12/14/2023. (mm)
December 13, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE by Richard Carlson, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Lara Newsom, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Jane Smith, John Smith, Brigit Stevens, Joseph Stevens / Plaintiffs' Notice to Court Regarding Hearing. (Edelstein, Laura)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PROTECTIVE ORDER AUTHORIZING MOVANTS TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/13/2023. (jeb)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and for a Protective Order. The Court will enter the proposed order submitted with the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 12/13/2023. (jeb)
December 13, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE by John Doe, Jane Smith, John Smith re Unopposed Motion for Leave to Proceed under Pseudonyms and for Protective Order. (Story, Thomas)
December 13, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE by Iowa Department of Education, Iowa State Board of Education, Kim Reynolds, McKenzie Snow REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING. (Johnston, Daniel)
December 13, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE by Molly Abraham, Matt Adams, Michael Andreski, Pam Arndorfer, Jill Caton Johnson, J. P. Claussen, Rosalie Daca, Matt Degner, Rod Earleywine, Charlie Eastham, Lance Ehmcke, Fannette Elliott, Janelle Ewing, Jayne Finch, Sue Flynn, Jan George, Dan Greenwell, Jeff Hicks, Katherine Howsare, Iowa City Community School District, Rachel Kent, Jesse Knight, Elizabeth Larson, Treyla Lee, Mitch Lingo, Ruthina Malone, Jenny Meade, Jason Menke, John Meyers, Bob Michaelson, Earl Miller, Stacie Mills, Julie Mitchell, Lila P. Montoya Starr, Anadelia Morgan, Steve Richman, Lyle Schmitt, Sioux City Community School District, Jared Smith, Jeff Sommerfeldt, Urbandale Community School District, Josh Van Rswyk, Waterloo Community School District, West Des Moines Community School District, Astor Williams, Carissa Williams, Lisa Williams, Margaret Young . (Vaught, Lindsay)
December 12, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa Den Herder on behalf of Iowa Department of Education, Iowa State Board of Education, Kim Reynolds, McKenzie Snow (Den Herder, Alexa)
December 12, 2023 Filing 38 Sealed Document: Email correspondence received by the Court from counsel. (mm)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christopher J. Blythe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 12/12/2023. (btg)
December 12, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5319217 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force. (Blythe, Christopher)
December 8, 2023 Filing 35 Sealed Document: Email correspondence received by the Court from counsel. (mm)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #27 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time in Case No. 4:23-cv-00474. Defendants' deadline for responding to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction in Case No. 4:23-cv-00474 is hereby extended to December 19, 2023. The same deadline will apply to Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction in Case No. 4:23-cv-00478 unless Plaintiffs in that case do not file their motion until after December 8, 2023, in which case Defendants will have an additional day until December 20, 2023 to file their response. The additional day would apply to Case No. 4:23-cv-00478 only. Plaintiffs in each case may file a reply, if any, by noon on December 21, 2023. No further extensions will be granted in either case. The hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction remains scheduled for December 22, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 265. To the extent they have not done so already, the Parties are reminded to comply with the Text Orders entered in each case on December 6, 2023, requiring the filing of Notices indicating whether the Party intends to present testimony at the preliminary injunction hearing. The Court reserves the right to begin the hearing on the afternoon of December 21, 2023, if necessary to ensure sufficient time. Signed by Judge Stephen H. Locher on 12/7/2023. (mm)
December 7, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric H. Wessan on behalf of Iowa Department of Education, Iowa State Board of Education, Kim Reynolds, McKenzie Snow (Wessan, Eric)
December 6, 2023 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Richard Carlson, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Brigit Stevens, John Smith, Lara Newsom, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, Jane Smith, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Joseph Stevens; Matt Adams waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Michael Andreski waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Jill Caton Johnson waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Fannette Elliott waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Jeff Hicks waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Elizabeth Larson waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Lila P Montoya Starr waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Anadelia Morgan waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; West Des Moines Community School District waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Story, Thomas)
December 6, 2023 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Richard Carlson, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Brigit Stevens, John Smith, Lara Newsom, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, Jane Smith, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Joseph Stevens; Pam Arndorfer waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Janelle Ewing waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Sue Flynn waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Jesse Knight waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Stacie Mills waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Lyle Schmitt waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Jared Smith waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Jeff Sommerfeldt waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Waterloo Community School District waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Astor Williams waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Story, Thomas)
December 6, 2023 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Richard Carlson, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Brigit Stevens, John Smith, Lara Newsom, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, Jane Smith, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Joseph Stevens; Rosalie Daca waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Katherine Howsare waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Rachel Kent waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Jenny Meade waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Urbandale Community School District waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Josh Van Rswyk waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Carissa Williams waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Margaret Young waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Story, Thomas)
December 6, 2023 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Richard Carlson, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Brigit Stevens, John Smith, Lara Newsom, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, Jane Smith, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Joseph Stevens; Rod Earleywine waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Lance Ehmcke waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Jan George waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Dan Greenwell waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Treyla Lee waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; John Meyers waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Bob Michaelson waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Earl Miller waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Sioux City Community School District waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Story, Thomas)
December 6, 2023 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Richard Carlson, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Brigit Stevens, John Smith, Lara Newsom, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, Jane Smith, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Joseph Stevens; Molly Abraham waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; J P Claussen waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Matt Degner waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Charlie Eastham waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Jayne Finch waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Iowa City Community School District waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Mitch Lingo waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Ruthina Malone waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024; Lisa Williams waiver served on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Story, Thomas)
December 6, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resist Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Iowa Department of Education, Iowa State Board of Education, Kim Reynolds, McKenzie Snow.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 12/20/2023. (Johnston, Daniel)
December 6, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Joe Johnston on behalf of Iowa Department of Education, Iowa State Board of Education, Kim Reynolds, McKenzie Snow (Johnston, Daniel)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER setting briefing schedule and hearing. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction on or before December 12, 2023. Plaintiffs shall file their reply, if any, on or before December 19, 2023. The Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiffs' motion on December 22, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 265. On or before December 13, 2023, each side must file a Notice stating whether it intends to present testimony at the hearing and, if so, the length of time it reasonably expects the testimony to last. The parties are advised that the Court may consolidate the hearing with a similar hearing in Case No. 4:23-cv-478. If necessary, the Court will have time available in the afternoon of December 21 if the parties believe a single day will be insufficient for the hearing. The parties should so advise in the Notices filed on or before December 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Stephen H. Locher on 12/6/2023. (mm)
December 5, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily A. Kolbe on behalf of Molly Abraham, Matt Adams, Michael Andreski, Pam Arndorfer, Jill Caton Johnson, J P Claussen, Rosalie Daca, Matt Degner, Rod Earleywine, Charlie Eastham, Lance Ehmcke, Fannette Elliott, Janelle Ewing, Jayne Finch, Sue Flynn, Jan George, Dan Greenwell, Jeff Hicks, Katherine Howsare, Iowa City Community School District, Rachel Kent, Jesse Knight, Elizabeth Larson, Treyla Lee, Mitch Lingo, Ruthina Malone, Jenny Meade, Jason Menke, John Meyers, Bob Michaelson, Earl Miller, Stacie Mills, Julie Mitchell, Lila P Montoya Starr, Anadelia Morgan, Steve Richman, Lyle Schmitt, Sioux City Community School District, Jared Smith, Jeff Sommerfeldt, Urbandale Community School District, Josh Van Rswyk, Waterloo Community School District, West Des Moines Community School District, Astor Williams, Carissa Williams, Lisa Williams, Margaret Young (Kolbe, Emily)
December 5, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay A. Vaught on behalf of Molly Abraham, Matt Adams, Michael Andreski, Pam Arndorfer, Jill Caton Johnson, J P Claussen, Rosalie Daca, Matt Degner, Rod Earleywine, Charlie Eastham, Lance Ehmcke, Fannette Elliott, Janelle Ewing, Jayne Finch, Sue Flynn, Jan George, Dan Greenwell, Jeff Hicks, Katherine Howsare, Iowa City Community School District, Rachel Kent, Jesse Knight, Elizabeth Larson, Treyla Lee, Mitch Lingo, Ruthina Malone, Jenny Meade, Jason Menke, John Meyers, Bob Michaelson, Earl Miller, Stacie Mills, Julie Mitchell, Lila P Montoya Starr, Anadelia Morgan, Steve Richman, Lyle Schmitt, Sioux City Community School District, Jared Smith, Jeff Sommerfeldt, Urbandale Community School District, Josh Van Rswyk, Waterloo Community School District, West Des Moines Community School District, Astor Williams, Carissa Williams, Lisa Williams, Margaret Young (Vaught, Lindsay)
December 4, 2023 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by McKenzie Snow, Iowa Department of Education, Kim Reynolds, Iowa State Board of Education; McKenzie Snow waiver served on 12/1/2023, answer due 1/30/2024; Iowa Department of Education waiver served on 12/1/2023, answer due 1/30/2024; Kim Reynolds waiver served on 12/1/2023, answer due 1/30/2024; Iowa State Board of Education waiver served on 12/1/2023, answer due 1/30/2024. (Johnston, Daniel)
December 1, 2023 Filing 21 ***FILED IN ERROR*** WAIVER to of the Service of Summons by All Defendants. (Johnston, Daniel) Modified on 12/4/2023 (sml).
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua Armstrong. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 11/30/2023. (nla)
November 30, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5308624 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force. (Armstrong, Joshua)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kara N. Ingelhart; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Katherine Mather. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 11/30/2023. (nla)
November 29, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5308067 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force. (Mather, Katherine)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anna Lyons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 11/29/2023. (nla)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Effiong Dampha; granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel Echeverri; granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Laura Joy Edelstein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 11/29/2023. (nla)
November 29, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5307658 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force. (Lyons, Anna)
November 29, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5307621 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force. (Edelstein, Laura)
November 29, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5307593 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force. (Echeverri, Daniel)
November 29, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5307434 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force. (Dampha, Effiong)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Camilla B. Taylor; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Karen Loewy; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nathan Maxwell; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sasha Buchert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 11/29/2023. (nla)
November 29, 2023 Filing 9 Summons - Note: Counsel should download the attached summons, in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure. (nla)
November 28, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5306618 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Richard Carlson, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Lara Newsom, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Jane Smith, John Smith, Brigit Stevens, Joseph Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Appendix List of admissions)(Story, Thomas)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5306611 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Richard Carlson, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Lara Newsom, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Jane Smith, John Smith, Brigit Stevens, Joseph Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Appendix List of admissions)(Story, Thomas)
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5306609 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Richard Carlson, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Lara Newsom, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Jane Smith, John Smith, Brigit Stevens, Joseph Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Appendix List of admissions)(Story, Thomas)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5306598 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Richard Carlson, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Lara Newsom, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Jane Smith, John Smith, Brigit Stevens, Joseph Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Appendix List of admissions)(Story, Thomas)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5306539 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Richard Carlson, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Lara Newsom, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Jane Smith, John Smith, Brigit Stevens, Joseph Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Appendix List of admissions)(Story, Thomas)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Protective Order and for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms by Richard Carlson, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Lara Newsom, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Jane Smith, John Smith, Brigit Stevens, Joseph Stevens.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 12/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Story, Thomas)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Richard Carlson, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Lara Newsom, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Jane Smith, John Smith, Brigit Stevens, Joseph Stevens. Responses due by 12/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Story, Thomas)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number AIASDC-5305614., filed by Richard Carlson, GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force, Brigit Stevens, John Smith, Lara Newsom, Ulrike Carlson, John Doe, Jane Smith, Eric Saylor, Belinda Scarrott, Joseph Stevens. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/26/2024. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Story, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force et al v. Reynolds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLBT Youth in Iowa Schools Task Force doing business as Iowa Safe Schools
Represented By: Thomas D. Story
Represented By: Kara N. Ingelhart
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Anna Lyons
Represented By: Camilla B. Taylor
Represented By: Christopher James Blythe
Represented By: Daniel Echeverri
Represented By: Effiong Dampha
Represented By: Joshua Armstrong
Represented By: Karen Loewy
Represented By: Katherine Mather
Represented By: Laura Joy Edelstein
Represented By: Nathan Maxwell
Represented By: Sasha Buchert
Represented By: Sharon Wegner
Represented By: Shefali Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Scarrott
Represented By: Thomas D. Story
Represented By: Anna Lyons
Represented By: Camilla B. Taylor
Represented By: Christopher James Blythe
Represented By: Daniel Echeverri
Represented By: Effiong Dampha
Represented By: Joshua Armstrong
Represented By: Kara N. Ingelhart
Represented By: Karen Loewy
Represented By: Katherine Mather
Represented By: Laura Joy Edelstein
Represented By: Nathan Maxwell
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Sasha Buchert
Represented By: Sharon Wegner
Represented By: Shefali Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Carlson
Represented By: Thomas D. Story
Represented By: Anna Lyons
Represented By: Camilla B. Taylor
Represented By: Christopher James Blythe
Represented By: Daniel Echeverri
Represented By: Effiong Dampha
Represented By: Joshua Armstrong
Represented By: Kara N. Ingelhart
Represented By: Karen Loewy
Represented By: Katherine Mather
Represented By: Laura Joy Edelstein
Represented By: Nathan Maxwell
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Sasha Buchert
Represented By: Sharon Wegner
Represented By: Shefali Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulrike Carlson
Represented By: Thomas D. Story
Represented By: Anna Lyons
Represented By: Camilla B. Taylor
Represented By: Christopher James Blythe
Represented By: Daniel Echeverri
Represented By: Effiong Dampha
Represented By: Joshua Armstrong
Represented By: Kara N. Ingelhart
Represented By: Karen Loewy
Represented By: Katherine Mather
Represented By: Laura Joy Edelstein
Represented By: Nathan Maxwell
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Sasha Buchert
Represented By: Sharon Wegner
Represented By: Shefali Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Saylor
Represented By: Thomas D. Story
Represented By: Anna Lyons
Represented By: Camilla B. Taylor
Represented By: Christopher James Blythe
Represented By: Daniel Echeverri
Represented By: Effiong Dampha
Represented By: Joshua Armstrong
Represented By: Kara N. Ingelhart
Represented By: Karen Loewy
Represented By: Katherine Mather
Represented By: Laura Joy Edelstein
Represented By: Nathan Maxwell
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Sasha Buchert
Represented By: Sharon Wegner
Represented By: Shefali Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brigit Stevens
Represented By: Thomas D. Story
Represented By: Camilla B. Taylor
Represented By: Christopher James Blythe
Represented By: Daniel Echeverri
Represented By: Effiong Dampha
Represented By: Joshua Armstrong
Represented By: Kara N. Ingelhart
Represented By: Karen Loewy
Represented By: Katherine Mather
Represented By: Laura Joy Edelstein
Represented By: Nathan Maxwell
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Sasha Buchert
Represented By: Sharon Wegner
Represented By: Shefali Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Stevens
Represented By: Thomas D. Story
Represented By: Anna Lyons
Represented By: Camilla B. Taylor
Represented By: Christopher James Blythe
Represented By: Daniel Echeverri
Represented By: Effiong Dampha
Represented By: Joshua Armstrong
Represented By: Kara N. Ingelhart
Represented By: Karen Loewy
Represented By: Katherine Mather
Represented By: Laura Joy Edelstein
Represented By: Nathan Maxwell
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Sasha Buchert
Represented By: Sharon Wegner
Represented By: Shefali Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Smith
Represented By: Thomas D. Story
Represented By: Anna Lyons
Represented By: Camilla B. Taylor
Represented By: Christopher James Blythe
Represented By: Daniel Echeverri
Represented By: Effiong Dampha
Represented By: Joshua Armstrong
Represented By: Kara N. Ingelhart
Represented By: Karen Loewy
Represented By: Katherine Mather
Represented By: Laura Joy Edelstein
Represented By: Nathan Maxwell
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Sasha Buchert
Represented By: Sharon Wegner
Represented By: Shefali Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Smith
Represented By: Thomas D. Story
Represented By: Anna Lyons
Represented By: Camilla B. Taylor
Represented By: Christopher James Blythe
Represented By: Daniel Echeverri
Represented By: Effiong Dampha
Represented By: Joshua Armstrong
Represented By: Kara N. Ingelhart
Represented By: Karen Loewy
Represented By: Katherine Mather
Represented By: Laura Joy Edelstein
Represented By: Nathan Maxwell
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Sasha Buchert
Represented By: Sharon Wegner
Represented By: Shefali Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lara Newsom
Represented By: Thomas D. Story
Represented By: Anna Lyons
Represented By: Camilla B. Taylor
Represented By: Christopher James Blythe
Represented By: Daniel Echeverri
Represented By: Effiong Dampha
Represented By: Joshua Armstrong
Represented By: Kara N. Ingelhart
Represented By: Karen Loewy
Represented By: Katherine Mather
Represented By: Laura Joy Edelstein
Represented By: Nathan Maxwell
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Sasha Buchert
Represented By: Sharon Wegner
Represented By: Shefali Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Thomas D. Story
Represented By: Anna Lyons
Represented By: Camilla B. Taylor
Represented By: Christopher James Blythe
Represented By: Daniel Echeverri
Represented By: Effiong Dampha
Represented By: Joshua Armstrong
Represented By: Kara N. Ingelhart
Represented By: Karen Loewy
Represented By: Katherine Mather
Represented By: Laura Joy Edelstein
Represented By: Nathan Maxwell
Represented By: Rita N. Bettis Austen
Represented By: Sasha Buchert
Represented By: Sharon Wegner
Represented By: Shefali Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Reynolds
Represented By: Daniel Joe Johnston
Represented By: Alexa Den Herder
Represented By: Eric H. Wessan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKenzie Snow
Represented By: Daniel Joe Johnston
Represented By: Alexa Den Herder
Represented By: Eric H. Wessan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Department of Education
Represented By: Daniel Joe Johnston
Represented By: Alexa Den Herder
Represented By: Eric H. Wessan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa State Board of Education
Represented By: Daniel Joe Johnston
Represented By: Alexa Den Herder
Represented By: Eric H. Wessan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa City Community School District
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Degner
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Abraham
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J P Claussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Eastham
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayne Finch
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruthina Malone
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Lingo
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Williams
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sioux City Community School District
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Earleywine
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Greenwell
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Ehmcke
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan George
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treyla Lee
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Meyers
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Michaelson
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Miller
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urbandale Community School District
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosalie Daca
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Howsare
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Kent
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Meade
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Menke
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Mitchell
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Richman
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Van Rswyk
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carissa Williams
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Young
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterloo Community School District
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Smith
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Flynn
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Knight
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astor Williams
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyle Schmitt
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacie Mills
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janelle Ewing
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Arndorfer
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sommerfeldt
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Des Moines Community School District
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Adams
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Hicks
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Andreski
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Larson
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lila P Montoya Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannette Elliott
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Caton Johnson
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadelia Morgan
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. P. Claussen
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lila P. Montoya Starr
Represented By: Lindsay A. Vaught
Represented By: Emily A. Kolbe
Represented By: Logan S. Brundage
Represented By: Miriam D. Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?