Pepitone v. Lollio et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Pepitone
Defendant: Gino Lollio, D-Trans LLC, Harcros Chemicals, Inc and Harcros Chemicals, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00484
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Office: Central Office
Presiding Judge: William P Kelly
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1364 Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 2/8/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly. Counsel shall call 1-877-411-9748 and enter code 1376500 at the prompt to join the call. The parties shall file a Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan as provided under Local Rule 16 by 2/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 1/8/2024. (rls)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas M. White. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 1/5/2024. (nla)
January 5, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5338300 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Elizabeth A. Pepitone. (McGinn, William)
December 28, 2023 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by D-Trans LLC. (Olson, Stephen)
December 21, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by William F McGinn on behalf of Elizabeth A. Pepitone (McGinn, William)
December 15, 2023 Filing 13 Defendants ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by D-Trans LLC, Gino Lollio.(Olson, Stephen)
December 5, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 12/22/2023. (sml)
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Nebraska; Case Number 8:23-cv-00498. Original file
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Defendants' unopposed motion to transfer, Filing No. #9 , is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Iowa. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
December 1, 2023 Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose and Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly added. (nla)
December 1, 2023 Case transferred to District of Southern District of Iowa. Original electronic file sent. No 30-day hold period per JFB chambers. (LKO)
November 29, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Change Venue by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant D-Trans LLC.(Olson, Stephen)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to defendant Harcros Chemicals, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to Harcros Chemicals, Inc regarding Amended Complaint #6 . (White, Thomas)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Thomas M. White on behalf of Elizabeth A. Pepitone(White, Thomas)
November 15, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants D-Trans LLC, Gino Lollio. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
November 15, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to D-Trans, LLC regarding Complaint, #1 . (White, Thomas)
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Gino Lollio regarding Complaint, #1 . (White, Thomas)
November 13, 2023 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
November 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants, by Attorney Thomas M. White on behalf of Elizabeth A. Pepitone (White, Thomas) Modified on 11/13/2023 to reflect that the correct plaintiff and that the $402 filing fee was paid, receipt number ANEDC-4974090 (LRM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepitone v. Lollio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Pepitone
Represented By: Thomas M. White
Represented By: William F McGinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gino Lollio
Represented By: Stephen G. Olson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Trans LLC
Represented By: Stephen G. Olson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harcros Chemicals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harcros Chemicals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?